Mars Area School District v. C. L.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 15-3780

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 5:30 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012188188 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (SY)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012163531 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
    ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant C. L., filed. (JPC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012163537 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant C. L. advising this court that no transcripts are available. (JPC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012163545 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant C. L., received. (JPC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012152796 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. Corcoran, Jr., Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) C.L.. (JPC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012152396 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas E. Breth, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Mars Area School District. (TEB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012151478 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
              FOLLOW UP LETTER to Thomas E. Breth, Esq. for Mars Area School District requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/24/2015. (MLR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012151469 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                FOLLOW UP LETTER to John P. Corcoran, Jr., Esq. for C.L. requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form, Information Statement, Concise Summary and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 12/24/2015. (MLR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012136268 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                  CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant C. L. in District Court No. 2-14-cv-01728. (MLR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 88 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?