Gray v. Koons et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-09727
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 11:48 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mitchel Gray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bender, Klaus-werner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence J McClure +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 ljmcclure@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kushnirsky Gerber Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence J McClure +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 ljmcclure@hhlaw.com
v.
No Logo Jeff Koons, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Phillips Auctioneers LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) (ii), Plaintiff Mitchel Gray and Defendants Jeff Koons and Phillips Auctioneers LLC, by and through their respective counsel, agree and stipulate that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/19/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
    AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 4/18/2016 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jk) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
      STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Mitchel Gray.(Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 26 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for 4/15/16 at 4:00 p.m. addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Jordan Fletcher dated 4/13/16. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. The conference is adjourned to April 22 at 11:00 a.m. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 4/22/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/13/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for 4/15/16 at 4:00 p.m. addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Jordan Fletcher dated 4/13/16. Document filed by Mitchel Gray.(Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: On April 7, 2016, this case was reassigned to this Court's docket. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference scheduled for April 15, 2016, at 4:00 p.m., shall take place before Judge Sidney H. Stein at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, in Courtroom 23A. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/8/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/4/2016) (cf) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
                ANSWER to 6 Complaint. Document filed by Phillips Auctioneers LLC.(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 6 Complaint. Document filed by Jeff Koons.(Gaffey, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mercury International Ltd, Corporate Parent Mercury Plc for Phillips Auctioneers LLC. Document filed by Phillips Auctioneers LLC.(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff Mitchel Gray and Defendant Jeff Koons that the time within which Mr. Koons may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including January 22, 2016. Jeff Koons answer due 1/22/2016. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/6/2016) (mro) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff Mitchel Gray and Defendant Phillips Auctioneers LLC ("Phillips") that the time within which Defendant Phillips may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including January 25, 2016. Phillips Auctioneers LLC answer due 1/25/2016. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/5/2016) (kko) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Moses Browning on behalf of Phillips Auctioneers LLC. (Browning, John) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Robinson on behalf of Phillips Auctioneers LLC. (Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Phillips Auctioneers LLC served on 12/18/2015, answer due 1/8/2016. Service was accepted by Jonathan Illari, Esq., Associate General Counsel. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jeff Koons served on 12/18/2015, answer due 1/8/2016. Service was accepted by David Jacobson, Managing Clerk, Jones Day. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Phillips Auctioneers LLC served on 12/18/2014, answer due 1/8/2015. Service was accepted by Jonathan Illari, Esq., Associate General Counsel. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) Modified on 1/4/2016 (kj). (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jeff Koons served on 12/18/2014, answer due 1/8/2015. Service was accepted by David Jacobson, Managing Clerk, Jones Day. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) Modified on 1/4/2016 (kj). (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jeff Koons served on 12/17/2014, answer due 1/7/2015. Service was accepted by David Jacobson, Managing Clerk, Jones Day. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) Modified on 1/4/2016 (kj). (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Phillips Auctioneers LLC served on 12/17/2014, answer due 1/7/2015. Service was accepted by Jonathan Illari, Esq., Associate General Counsel. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) Modified on 1/4/2016 (kj). (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                          AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dgo) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phillips Auctioneers LLC. (dgo) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeff Koons. (dgo) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT against John Doe, Jeff Koons, Phillips Auctioneers LLC. Document filed by Mitchel Gray.(Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Isaac Gerber on behalf of Mitchel Gray. (Gerber, Andrew) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phillips Auctioneers LLC, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeff Koons, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Mitchel Gray. (Fletcher, Jordan) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11729930)Document filed by Mitchel Gray.(Fletcher, Jordan) Modified on 12/15/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 408 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?