GRACE et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-02234

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2018 at 3:27 PM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MATTHEW GRACE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo PINK PISTOLS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
No Logo CATHY LANIER, Defendant
District of Columbia District of Columbia, Defendant
No Logo Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 +1 202 637 5910 adam.levin@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Everytown for Gun Safety, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Wessler PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com
No Logo National Rifle Association of America, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 pclement@bancroftpllc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Elizabeth Murphy +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 emurphy@bancroftpllc.com
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                  Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the DC Government re 52 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, 45 Memorandum & Opinion by CATHY LANIER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Saindon, Andrew) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 48 MOTION to Stay re 46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, 45 Memorandum & Opinion and Motion for Immediate Administrative Stay filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Saindon, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in opposition to re 48 MOTION to Stay re 46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, 45 Memorandum & Opinion and Motion for Immediate Administrative Stay filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 49 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Chad A. Naso as counsel for defendants by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Saindon, Andrew) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                            LREF
                            Blank 48 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Stay re 46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, 45 Memorandum & Opinion and Motion for Immediate Administrative Stay by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                              LREF
                              Blank 47 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. Attorney Chad Alan Naso terminated. (Naso, Chad) Modified on 5/20/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                LREF
                                Blank 46 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: For the reason set forth in accompanying Memorandum Opinion entered this date, it is hereby ordered that the plaintiff's 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED; and it is further ordered that plaintiff's 6 Motion for Permanent Injunction is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ordered that plaintiff's 37 Motion to Consolidate the Preliminary Injunction Proceedings with the Determination on the Merits is DENIED. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETALS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/17/16. (tb) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/17/16. (tb) Modified on 5/17/2016 (tb). (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Response to Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Amicus Brief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Short Response Brief by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (See Docket Entry 27 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF by EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1, # 2 Appendix Part 2, # 3 Appendix Part 3)(znmw) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA. (znmw) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Standing Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Mayor for DC
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 390 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?