Saunders v. Luthern Social Services of Central Ohio Faith Mission
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-03100

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2018 at 9:15 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 2 Report and Recommendations,, 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joachim Saunders. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 1/21/16. (kn)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and 2 Complaint filed by Joachim Saunders. It is RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be denied and that this action be di smissed for failure to state a claim for relief. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/30/2015. (pes)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 4 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?