Borrelli v. McDermott
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-01857

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 22, 2020 at 5:44 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard Borrelli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 409

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M. Merly +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jmerly@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Brian McDermott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Wolak, III +1 203 946 7970 +1 203 946 7942 mwolak@newhavenct.gov
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Release of Funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Marked Exhibit List by Brian McDermott. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Witness List
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Marked Witness List by Brian McDermott. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Marked Exhibit List by Richard Borrelli. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Witness List
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Marked Witness List by Richard Borrelli. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Oral Order granting 36 Oral Motion To Sequester Witnesses by Plaintiff; Bench Trial begun on 2/10/2017; Bench Trial held on 2/10/2017.; Bench Trial completed on 2/10/2017; Decision Reserved. Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2017 re 36 Oral Motion To Sequester Witnesses By Plaintiff Order filed by Richard Borrelli. Total Time: 3 hours(Court Reporter R. Dixon.) (Wood, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Oral Motion To Sequester Witnesses by Richard Borrelli. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: Due to the anticipated inclement weather, the bench trial scheduled to begin on 2/9/17 is continued to 2/10/17 at 10:00 AM. The parties and witnesses must arrive no later than 9:45 AM and be prepared to begin promptly at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/8/17. (Brierley, K.) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martinez: Final pretrial conference held on 2/2/2017. Total time: 15 minutes. (Brierley, K.) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martinez: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/3/2016. Total time: 5 minutes. The parties indicate that a settlement conference would not be productive at this time. If at any time, the parties wish to have a settlement conference, they may request one by contacting chambers. (Brierley, K.) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 11/3/16 at 11:00 AM before Judge Martinez. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call and shall have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at 860-240-3605. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 10/17/16. (Brierley, K.) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER. The telephonic status conference is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/13/2016. (Connelly, L.) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER. On May 26, 2016, Defendant filed a 21 Motion to Dismiss, in which he contends that the Court should dismiss this action under D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.3(a) because Plaintiff had not posted the security for costs previously ordered by the Court (see ECF No. 13). On June 2, 2016, Plaintiff filed the appropriate amount of security for costs with the Clerk of the Court. As a result, Defendant's 21 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/6/2016. (Osher, D.) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss SUMMARY by Brian McDermott.Responses due by 6/16/2016 (Wolak, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production, dated April 4, 2016, on or before June 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/18/2016. (Osher, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/24/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Michael P. Shea. Discovery due by 2/1/2017; Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2017; Joint Status Report due by 10/17/2016; Joint Trial Brief due by 4/15/2017. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/24/16.(Johnson, D.) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Response
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties' compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties file on or before April 4, 2016 (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a Form 26(f) report; or (2) a Form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties' failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/21/2016.(Osher, D.) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 02/05/16. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Security for Costs
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER. Defendant's 10 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant shall submit responsive pleadings on or before March 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/2/2016. (Osher, D.) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Electronic Service Documents
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/22/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/22/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 03/22/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2016; Discovery due by 6/22/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2016. Signed by Clerk on 12/22/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?