Franco v. Allied Interstate LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-4003

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 4:55 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 03/09/2016, to SDNY/NYNY, ISSUED.[1722994] [15-4003] [Entered: 03/09/2016 01:40 PM]
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to hold appeal in abeyance [34] filed by Appellee Allied Interstate LLC, by RCW, FILED. [1722986][42] [15-4003] [Entered: 03/09/2016 01:34 PM]
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
      REPLY TO OPPOSITION [36], on behalf of Appellee Allied Interstate LLC, FILED. Service date 03/04/2016 by CM/ECF.[1719475][38] [15-4003] [Entered: 03/04/2016 01:30 PM]
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
        OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance [34], on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED. Service date 02/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1715039] [15-4003] [Entered: 02/29/2016 03:37 PM]
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
          MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellee Allied Interstate LLC, FILED. Service date 02/26/2016 by CM/ECF. [1714160] [15-4003] [Entered: 02/26/2016 03:35 PM]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
            SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Gilberto Franco Brief due date as 03/15/2016; Joint Appendix due date as 03/15/2016, FILED.[1684683] [15-4003] [Entered: 01/14/2016 04:21 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
              NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[1684653] [15-4003] [Entered: 01/14/2016 04:10 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED. Service date 01/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1684493] [15-4003] [Entered: 01/14/2016 03:22 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [23], on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED.[1680575] [15-4003] [Entered: 01/11/2016 10:43 AM]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                    LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, informing Court of proposed due date 03/15/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 12/30/2015 by CM/ECF.[1674296] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/30/2015 04:18 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [19], on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED.[1673637] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/30/2015 08:47 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [17], on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED.[1673174] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/29/2015 02:04 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [14], on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED.[1672596] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/29/2015 08:45 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
                            FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED. Service date 12/28/2015 by CM/ECF.[1672567] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/28/2015 08:34 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Allied Interstate LLC, FILED. Service date 12/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1668777] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/21/2015 12:53 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED. Service date 12/17/2015 by CM/ECF. [1666717] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/17/2015 01:22 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED. Service date 12/17/2015 by CM/ECF.[1666712] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/17/2015 01:17 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                    ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1663203] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/14/2015 02:00 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                      DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1663192] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/14/2015 01:57 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                        DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 11/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1663190] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/14/2015 01:55 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                          DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/02/2014, RECEIVED.[1663185] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/14/2015 01:53 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gilberto Franco, FILED. [1663180] [15-4003] [Entered: 12/14/2015 01:48 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?