City of Cedar Rapids v. Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00070
District Judge Mark W Bennett, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:52 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cedar Rapids, City of, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AHLERS & COONEY PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Michael Craig +1 515 246 0372 +1 515 243 2149 jcraig@ahlerslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Remsburg +1 515 243 7611 +2432 243 243 2149 eremsburg@ahlerslaw.com
v.
No Logo Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Simmons Perrine Albright & Ellwood P.L.C.

Toggle Switch Represented by SIMMONS PERRINE MOYER BERGMAN PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger W Stone +1 319 366 7641 +3661 366 366 1917 rstone@simmonsperrine.com
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard T Strand +1 319 366 7641 lstrand@simmonsperrine.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence T Hofmann +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 lhofmann@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan F Mack +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 jmack@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by City of Cedar Rapids (Remsburg, Edward) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF CASE SETTLEMENT: The court has been advised that this action has been settled - The parties shall have to and including 07/31/10 to file their settlement documents. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 07/01/10. (kfs) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark W Bennett: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/22/2010. (Court Reporter - Shelly Semmler) (src) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER SETTING HEARING - Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/22/2010 1:30 PM before Judge Mark W Bennett. The court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 06/21/2010. (src) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
          Docket Annotation re 27 Expedited Relief Requested MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Bound and tabbed copy received in clerk's office. House with file. (ksy) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Resetting Trial (New Date and New Location), Final Pretrial Conference, and Stating New/Additional Requirements for Final Pretrial Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 28 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 21 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 28 days before FPTC. Jury Trial reset for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in 4200 C Street SW, Building B, Courtroom 2 before Judge Mark W Bennett. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/17/2010 03:00 PM in SC 1st Fl Ct before Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2010. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/18/2010. (des) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Change Venue - Denying 27 Motion to Consolidate Cases - A new trial management order in each case will follow. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 06/18/10. (kfs) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark W Bennett - Motion Hearing held on 06/18/2010 RE: 25 Motion to Change Venue of Trial and 27 Motion to Consolidate Cases - Order to follow (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (kfs) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                  RESISTANCE to Motion re 27 Expedited Relief Requested MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Cedar Rapids. (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER setting expedited hearing on 27 Motion to Consolidate Cases - Expedited Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 06/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark W Bennett. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 06/17/10. (kfs) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                      Expedited Relief Requested, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit A-V) (Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                        BRIEF in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Change Venue of Trial filed by Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (Stone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Change Venue of Trial by Plaintiff City of Cedar Rapids (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Compel (See Order Text). Signed by Chief Magistrate Paul A Zoss on 8/18/09. (des) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Paul A Zoss: Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2009 re 20 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by City of Cedar Rapids. Granted in part, denied in part - Order to follow. (Digital Recording) (des) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                BRIEF in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Strand, Leonard) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER setting telephonic hearing on 20 Motion to Compel Discovery - Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 08/17/2009 at 3:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss - The court will initiate the conference call - The parties are directed to inform the Court of who will be participating in the conference call by calling Leslie Walker at (712) 233-3921 by 08/14/09 or they will not be included on the conference call. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 07/29/09. (kfs) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff City of Cedar Rapids (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, Declaration of Edward W. Remsburg, # 6 Exhibit 5) (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER - Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC - Exhibits marked - Jury Instructions 14 days before FPTC - Motions in Limine 14 days before FPTC - Jury Trial set for 08/09/2010 at 9:00 AM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Judge Mark W Bennett - Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/27/2010 at 3:00 PM in SC 1st Fl Ct before Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss - Proposed Pretrial Order ddl 07/23/2010. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 06/25/09. (kfs) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                        ORDER - granting 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Expert Witness Deadlines filed by City of Cedar Rapids. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 9/3/2009. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 11/5/2009. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 12/2/2009. Signed by Chief Magistrate Paul A Zoss on 06/19/09. (src) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Expert Witness Deadlines by Plaintiff City of Cedar Rapids (Remsburg, Edward) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 03/11/09. (ak) Modified on 3/11/2009 correction of judge (ak). (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN - Initial Disclosures ddl 10/17/08 but not filed with the court - Add Parties ddl 03/03/2009 - Amended Pleadings ddl 03/03/2009 - Plaintiffs Expert Witness ddl 07/03/2009 - Defendants Expert Witness ddl 09/03/2009 - Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts ddl 10/02/2009 - Discovery ddl 01/04/2010 - Motions ddl 03/03/2010 - Trial Ready ddl 07/05/2010. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 10/06/08. (kfs) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to 2 Complaint, by Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC.(Stone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER granting 8 Attorney Lawrence T. Hofmann's Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 9 Attorney Jonathan F. Mack's Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 10 Attorney Rory D. Zamansky's Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 07/28/08. (ak) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                      PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendant by Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC (Stone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion of Rory D. Zamansky for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 08620000000000684089) by Defendant Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CMECF Registration) (Stone, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/29/2008 forwarded Attorney Registration to MP (ak). (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion of Jonathan F. Mack for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 08620000000000684088) by Defendant Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CMECF Registration) (Stone, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/29/2008 forwarded Attorney Registration to MP (ak). (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Lawrence T. Hofmann for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 08620000000000684081) by Defendant Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC (Stone, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/29/2008 clarified text. Clerk verified spelling of attorney's name with firm. The Signature of document contains incorrect spelling, however, typed version is correctly spelled. (ak). (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Stone on behalf of Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC (Stone, Jeffrey) (Emailed to Attorney Roger Stone per ECF error.)Modified on 7/28/2008 (jm). (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed (Amended and Substituted) by City of Cedar Rapids. Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC served on 6/30/2008, answer due 7/21/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Summons and Return of Service) (Craig, Jason) Modified on 7/3/2008 to add text re name of document (des). (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Cedar Rapids. Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC served on 6/6/2008, answer due 6/26/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Return of Service) (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Docket Annotation re 3 Summons Issued: Corrected Summons added to 3 Entry and also added to this Docket Annotation per Docketing error. (jm) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Brokerage Services, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: # 1 Civil Case Packet) (jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2008: # 2 Corrected Summons) (jm). (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against all defendants, filed by City of Cedar Rapids. Scheduling Report due by 10/16/2008 (Receipt Number 08620000000000657172 - Amount $350) (Attachment #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Craig, Jason) Modified text on 06/06/2008 (kfs) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by City of Cedar Rapids. (jm) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?