Ba v. Ridenhour
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01669
District Judge Thomas Selby Ellis, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 12:12 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Arnaud Ba, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnaud Ba

v.
No Logo Ches, Defendant
No Logo Chris, Defendant
No Logo Zachary Ridenhour, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- It is hereby ORDERED that the Court ADOPTS as its own the magistrate judge's findings of fact and recommendation; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED forfailure to st ate a claim, without prejudice to plaintiffs right to file an amended complaint that states a viable cause of action against specifically named defendants' by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, October 27, 2016. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/27/2016. (dest, ) (copy mailed as directed in the Order)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Arnaud Ba Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 9/9/2016. (dest, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arnaud Ba. (dest, ) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arnaud Ba.(dest, ) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 295 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?