USA v. Tomasack
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cr-00418-WDQ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie S Greenberg +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 3124 Bonnie.Greenberg@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Baltimore
Filed 9/19/2002
County Baltimore County
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871 THREAT AGAINST THE PRESIDENT
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
REPORT & ORDER on Offender Under Supervision as to George Edward Tomasack, Jr. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 6/11/08.(c/m af) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
    Report on Offender under Supervision & ORDER APPROVING as to George Edward Tomasack, Jr. Signed by Judge William D Quarles Jr. on 9/26/07. (c/m to N. Vallandingham) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT as to George Edward Tomasack, Jr. (1), Count(s) 1, Imprisonment 24 months; Supervised Release 3 years; Special Assessment $100.00. Signed by Judge William D Quarles Jr. on 9/28/05. (c/m af) (amf, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2005 (amf, Deputy Clerk).
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Sentencing
        Sentencing as to George Edward Tomasack, Jr held on 9/23/2005 before Judge William D Quarles Jr.. (Court Reporter Martin Giordano.) (rhl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Sentencing OrderCourt Filing
          Guideline Sentencing Order as to George Edward Tomasack, Jr. Signed by Judge William D Quarles Jr. on 7/18/05. (c/m by chambers) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Sealed Document +
            Sealed Document. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER that the Defendant be committed to the custody of the Attorney General for placement in a suitable hospital facility for care or treatment and that this commitment constitutes a provisional sentence of 5 years imprisonment, that being the statutory maximum for the offense to which the Defendant pled guilty as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. (3cc c/s hd to USM in Open Court, 2c/s to Defendantt's counsel and a c/s AUSA rl). Signed by Judge William D Quarles on 04/24/03. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Exhibit
                EXHIBIT LIST (Plea Agreement) by USA as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
                  Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 04/24/03. as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
                    Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 04/24/03. as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 3/11/2004 Sentencing
                      Sentencing as to George Edward Tomasack Jr.. held before Judge William D Quarles Jr.. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Arraignment
                        Defendant had initial appearance, was "ARRAIGNED", plead "GUILTY" and provisional sentence entered under Title 18 Section 4244 (d) and (e), for reasons stated in open Court as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. (1) Count 1 held on 4/24/2003 before Judge William D Quarles. (Court Reporter ER.) (rhl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                          Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. for April 24, 2003. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                            Case as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. reassigned to Judge William D Quarles. Judge Frederic N. Smalkin no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to George Edward Tomasack Jr., Appointing Federal Public Defender ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 4/20/02) (c/d fpd hsg) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by George Edward Tomasack Jr. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Warrant Issued
                                  Bench WARRANT issued as to George Edward Tomasack Jr. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER as to George Edward Tomasack Jr., for issuance of Bench warrant ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 9/19/02) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Indictment
                                      INDICTMENT as to George Edward Tomasack (1) count(s) 1 (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 7/23/2003 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT as to George Edward Tomasack Jr.. (dms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?