Strong v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-00466

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 6:34 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Reply Brief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Reply Brief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Brief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Objection
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Brief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Brief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Clerk's Entry of Default
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER - The parties must advise the Court of the status of HSBC and US Bank as defendants within ten (10) days of the date of this order. Caliber's Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, for More Definite Statement (Filing No. 9) and K&Ms Motio n to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement (Filing No. 11 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part in accordance with the terms of this order. The motions are granted to the extent they seek a more definite statement and denied to the extent they seek dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Strong shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with this order no later than August 12, 2016. Failing to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of the Complaint. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed) (MKR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Order - Pro Se GO 2007-12
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Reassignment Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?