Booth v. Cruz
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Hampshire District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00518

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 9:24 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Booth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Booth +1 603 783 4743 cb7384229@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Ted Cruz, Defendant
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None order on report and recommendation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Objection to Magistrate Judges Decision Rule 72a
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Intervene
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    PRO SE MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Christopher Booth.(lml) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Financial Affidavit filed by Christopher Booth.(lml) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            COMPLAINT entitled "Pro se Petitioner Christopher Booth New Hampshire Citizen Petitions for Injunction to Remove Ted Cruz from New Hampshire Presidential Primary Ballot against Ted Cruz filed by Christopher Booth.(lml) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 30 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?