WEBER v. BASIC COMFORT, INC.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-06541
District Judge Ronald L. Buckwalter, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ronald L. Buckwalter
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 6:47 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo JOAN E. WEBER, Plaintiff

Represented by National IP Rights Center, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott J. Fields, Esquire
v.
No Logo Basic Comfort, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abbe F. Fletman +1 215 279 9388 abbe.fletman@flastergreenberg.com

Represented by Kleinbard, Bell & Brecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ZACHARY C. GLASER +1 215 568 2000 +1 215 568 0140 zglaser@kleinbard.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: None
Acknowledgment of receipt of record from USDC for District of Colorado (ph) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) IS GRANTED. THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLORADO. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ) 4/17/01 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (kw) (Entered: 04/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: None
Sur reply brief by PLAINTIFF JOAN E. WEBER in opposition to MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE , Certificate of Service. (ph) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: None
Addition of Exhibit E to plaintiff's reply in opposition to the motion to transfer venue, Certificate of service (ph) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: None
Reply by DEFENDANT BASIC COMFORT, INC. in support of MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE , Certificate of Service. (ph) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None
Memorandum by PLAINTIFF JOAN E. WEBER in opposition to MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE , Certificate of Service. (ph) (Entered: 03/27/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: None
MOTION by DEFENDANT BASIC COMFORT, INC. TO CHANGE VENUE , MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (ph) (Entered: 03/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
Affidavit of: Felina Swaba re: served summons and complaint upon John Lord (President) on behalf of DEFENDANT BASIC COMFORT, INC. . Served by: Personal Service on 2/12/01 . (md) (Entered: 02/22/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 3/5/01 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD ( SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ) 2/12/01 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (ph) (Entered: 02/12/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
Copy of Form to Commissioner of Patent. (tj) (Entered: 12/29/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
Complaint. filing fee $ 150 receipt # 750243 (tj) (Entered: 12/29/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 42 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?