IYM Technologies LLC v. Texas Instruments Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-02118

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 5:59 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iym Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
Space Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
Space Charles Wizenfeld +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 charles.wizenfeld@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haltom & Doan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Haltom Doan +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 jdoan@haltomdoan.com
Space Brent Douglas McCabe +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 bmccabe@haltomdoan.com
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?