Fisher v. Duff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-05944-BHS

Tags
Last Updated September 28, 2017 at 1:35 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRYNDON FISHER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGlinchey Stafford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beth E Terrell +1 206 816 6603 +1 206 350 3528

Toggle Switch Represented by Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similary Situated Miranda P Kolbe +1 415 788 4220 +1 415 788 0161 mkolbe@schubert-reed.com
Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similary Situated Noah Michael Schubert +1 415 788 4220 +1 415 788 0161 nschubert@sjk.law
Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similary Situated Robert C. Schubert +1 415 788 4220 + 415 788 0161 rschubert@schubert-reed.com
v.
Administrative Office of the United States Courts Administrative Office of the United States Courts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah K Morehead +1 206 553 2257 sarah.morehead@usdoj.gov
No Logo James C Duff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in His Official Capacity as the Director of the Administrative Office of the United States Courts Sarah K Morehead +1 206 553 2257 sarah.morehead@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah K Morehead +1 206 553 2257 sarah.morehead@usdoj.gov
Office Tacoma
Filed 12/29/2015
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Clark
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
JUDGMENT BY COURT. (MGC) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
      Stipulated MOTION to Extend Initial Scheduling Dates, and [Proposed] Order by Plaintiff Bryndon Fisher. Noting Date 6/13/2016, (Schubert, Noah) Modified on 6/14/2016 (GMR). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
        REPLY, filed by Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Bryndon Fisher, to 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint: Noting Date 5/13/2016.(TG) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Bryndon Fisher. Noting Date 4/20/2016, (Schubert, Robert) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                Agreed MOTION to Stay Initial Scheduling Dates by Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America. Noting Date 4/13/2016, (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Anna Marie Garcia filed by Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/29/2016, (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America, filed by Bryndon Fisher.(Schubert, Noah) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION of Anna Marie Garcia filed by Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America re 14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/1/2016, (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Related Case(s) Bryndon Fisher, Individually and Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated v. United States of America, 1:15-cv-01575C, pending in the United States Court of Federal Claims before The Honorable Thomas C. Wheeler, by Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America. (Morehead, Sarah) Modified on 2/22/2016 to correct docket text so as to correctly identify the attached document (GMR). (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Defendants Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America. (Morehead, Sarah) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sandra Bowers, Designee, Person Authorized to Accept Service for The United States of America c/o United States Attorney 's Office on 1/6/2016, filed by Plaintiff Bryndon Fisher. (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                  ORDER on the 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Miranda P Kolbe for Bryndon Fisher, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                    ORDER on the 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Noah M Schubert for Bryndon Fisher, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                      ORDER on the 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert C Schubert for Bryndon Fisher, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(GMR) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Miranda P. Kolbe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bryndon Fisher (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4287518 (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Noah M. Schubert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bryndon Fisher (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4287517 (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert C. Schubert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bryndon Fisher (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4287516 (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/12/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/26/2016, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: 12/29/2015 Summons Issued
                                                  Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Administrative Office of the United States Courts, James C Duff, The United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Summons)(MET)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: 12/29/2015 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4282103) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Bryndon Fisher(pty:pla), filed by Bryndon Fisher. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons James C. Duff, # (3) Summons Administrative Office of the United States Courts, # (4) Summons The United States of America)(Terrell, Beth)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                    Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MET)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 337 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?