Brandywine Professional Servic v. Steven Quigley, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 15-3850

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 12:25 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012149429 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Brandywine Professional Services LLC in District Court No. 2-13-cv-02865. (ARR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012166061 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
    Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (SY)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012159087 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexander D. Bono, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) TD Bank, N.A.. (ADB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012158566 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TD Bank NA, filed. (REB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012158563 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ryan E. Borneman on behalf of Appellee(s) TD Bank, N.A.. (REB)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012155912 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Brandywine Professional Services, received. (DPM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012155318 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Brandywine Professional Services, filed. (DPM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012155315 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Brandywine Professional Services advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (DPM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012155312 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Brandywine Professional Services, filed. (DPM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012155299 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel P. McElhatton on behalf of Appellant(s) Brandywine Professional Services. (DPM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 143 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?