McLellan et al v. Fitbit, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00036-JD
District Judge James Donato, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2020 at 12:27 AM DT (8.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amber Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Bruce Morgan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Kelly M. Dermody +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kdermody@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo David Urban, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Kelly M. Dermody +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kdermody@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo James Schorr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Kelly M. Dermody +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kdermody@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo John Molenstra, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney E. Maccarone cmaccarone@zlk.com
Space Rosemary M. Rivas +1 415 291 2420 +1 415 484 1294 rrivas@zlk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Judith Landers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney E. Maccarone cmaccarone@zlk.com
Space Rosemary M. Rivas +1 415 291 2420 +1 415 484 1294 rrivas@zlk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Kate McLellan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Kelly M. Dermody +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kdermody@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Lisa Marie Burke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney E. Maccarone cmaccarone@zlk.com
Space Rosemary M. Rivas +1 415 291 2420 +1 415 484 1294 rrivas@zlk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Rachel Saito, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Kelly M. Dermody +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kdermody@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Rhonda Callan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo ROBERT DUNN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Kelly M. Dermody +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kdermody@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Teresa Black, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
No Logo Todd Rubinstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Howard Klonoff +1 503 291 1570 +1 202 626 1700 klonoff@usa.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Joseph Ballan +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 eballan@lchb.com
Space Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Budner +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kbudner@lchb.com
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
Space Kelly M. Dermody +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 kdermody@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan David Selbin +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jselbin@lchb.com
v.
No Logo Fitbit, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kai S Bartolomeo +1 213 892 5258 kbartolomeo@mofo.com
Space Erin McCalmon Bosman +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 ebosman@mofo.com
Space David Frank McDowell +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 dmcdowell@mofo.com
Space Julie Park +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 juliepark@mofo.com
Space Anna Erickson White +1 650 813 5600 +1 415 268 7522 awhite@mofo.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Office San Francisco
Filed 1/5/2016
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Statistical Closing
County San Francisco
Terminated 3/27/2019
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
316-cv-00036-JD
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED,CONSOL,PROTO,PRVADR,RELATE
  Entries (175) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019 stipulation
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Status report
    STATUS REPORT THIRD JOINT REPORT REGARDING STATUS OF ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS by Fitbit, Inc.. (McDowell, David) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 169 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER. The Court administratively closes this case pending completion of the arbitration proceedings. The closing is for administrative purposes only, and is not a dismissal or disposition of the action. The parties are directed to continue filing quarterly status reports as previously ordered. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/27/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
        NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jonathan David Selbin (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019 Notice of Change In Counsel
          NOTICE of Change In Counsel by William Lewis Stern (Stern, William) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019 Notice of Change In Counsel
            NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andrea Clisura (Clisura, Andrea) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Status report
              STATUS REPORT SECOND (JOINT) REPORT RE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS by Fitbit, Inc.. (McDowell, David) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Status report
                STATUS REPORT (JOINT) RE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS by Fitbit, Inc.. (McDowell, David) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice - other
                  NOTICE by Lisa Marie Burke, Judith Landers, John Molenstra re Change of Phone Number by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Notice of change of address
                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrea Clisura and Courtney E. Maccarone (Clisura, Andrea) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Notice - other
                      NOTICE by Fitbit, Inc. Joint Notice Re: Fees and Costs Pursuant to Court's July 24, 2018 Order (McDowell, David) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 160 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER re [159]. The parties' jointly requested extension of time is fine. Plaintiffs' motion for fees and costs is due August 21, 2018. Defendant's response is due August 28, 2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/10/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018, Terminated: 8/10/2018 stipulation
                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Extending Time to File and Respond to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Related to Arbitration Order filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge James Donato granting [156] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Laura B. Heiman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Frank McDowell (McDowell, David) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018, Terminated: 8/3/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12559789.) filed by Kate McLellan. (Heiman, Laura) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 155 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER re [154]. McLellan may file the proposed motion as a statement. The Court will wait to see if AAA takes any further action under its internal procedures to deal with the situation. This development and future developments should be included in the next quarterly status report, at which time the court may revisit the issue. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/30/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 motion for leave to file
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER RE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/24/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 statement
                                        Statement re [148] Statement, [146] Statement, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Statement on the Status of Arbitration Proceedings by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 151 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 order on motion for leave to file
                                          Order granting [150] Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff should file the reply as a separate ECF entry. No further briefing from either side is needed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/4/2018, Entered: 7/4/2018, Terminated: 7/5/2018 motion for leave to file
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Statement on the Status of Arbitration Proceedings filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief, # (2) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/4/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint byFitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 statement
                                                Statement re [146] Statement, Response to Plaintiffs Statement on the Status of Arbitration Proceedings by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William L. Stern, # (2) Exhibit 1 through 15 to Stern Declaration, # (3) Declaration of Kai S. Bartolomeo, # (4) Exhibit 1 through 2 to Bartolomeo Declaration, # (5) Declaration of Gloria Lee)(Stern, William) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint against Fitbit, Inc.. Filed byRobert Dunn. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 statement
                                                    Statement on the Status of Arbitration Proceedings by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Selbin Declaration, # (2) Exhibit B McLellan Declaration, # (3) Exhibit C Blaisdell Declaration, # (4) Exhibit D Budner Declaration)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/31/2018 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 144 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER re [128] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/5/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/31/2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [142] Transcript Order, [140] Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2018. (Related documents(s) [142], [140]) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/31/2018 before Judge James Donato by Fitbit, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Bartolomeo, Kai) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2018. Total Time in Court: 39 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/31/2018 before Judge James Donato by Kate McLellan, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [129] MOTION to Strike [127] Stipulation, Motion to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint ) Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Strike Class Allegations filed byRobert Dunn. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER. Plaintiff may file the proposed sur-reply at Dkt. No. [137]. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018, Terminated: 5/29/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Strike Class Allegations filed by Robert Dunn. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Strike Class Allegations, # (2) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 statement
                                                                        Statement of Recent Decision (Epic Systems v. Lewis) by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stern, William) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                          REPLY (re [128] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint (Dkt. No. 127-1) ) filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                            REPLY (re [129] MOTION to Strike [127] Stipulation, Motion to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint ) filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [129] MOTION to Strike [127] Stipulation, Motion to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint ) filed byRobert Dunn. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [128] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint (Dkt. No. 127-1) ) filed byRobert Dunn. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 terminate deadlines and hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER. The proposed dates and deadlines at [130] are fine. The hearings on the motion to strike [129] and the motion to dismiss [128] are set for 5/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018, Terminated: 3/26/2018 stipulation
                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [129] MOTION to Strike [127] Stipulation, Motion to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint, [128] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint (Dkt. No. 127-1) -- Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-2 filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                      MOTION to Strike [127] Stipulation, Motion to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint filed by Fitbit, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/27/2018. Replies due by 4/3/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stern, William) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018, Terminated: 6/5/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint (Dkt. No. 127-1) filed by Fitbit, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/27/2018. Replies due by 4/3/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stern, William) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATION Granting Leave to File Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - Second Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re Motion for Partial Reconsideration (Dkt. No. [115]). Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/24/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER. The parties have filed discovery letter briefs, Dkt. Nos. [120], [123], advising the Court that Fitbit has declined to answer any discovery requests made by plaintiff Robert Dunn, who is not subject to the Courts arbitration order. Dkt. No. [114] at 9. This is inappropriate. Regardless of the ultimate disposition of the motion to reconsider, jurisdiction was established under CAFA at the time the complaint was filed and is not defeated by post-filing developments. See, e.g., Rea v. Michaels Stores Inc., 742 F.3d 1234, 1237 (9th Cir. 2014); Visendi v. Bank of Am., N.A., 733 F.3d 863, 868 (9th Cir. 2013). Consequently, Fitbit is ordered to respond to discovery within 3 weeks. As Dunn has volunteered, discovery will be targeted to Dunns individual claims. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/18/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Opinion)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [120] Discovery Letter Brief by Fitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER. Fitbit is directed to file a response to plaintiffs' discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. [120], by December 21, 2017. The response should not exceed three pages and should otherwise comply with the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/15/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 1/18/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                        Discovery Letter Brief filed by Robert Dunn. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Brief
                                                                                                          Brief re [116] Order,,, Set Deadlines,, Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Reconsideration or, Alternatively, for Order Certifying Issue for Appeal filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Related document(s)[116]) (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Brief
                                                                                                            Brief re [116] Order,,, Set Deadlines,, Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration or for Order Certifying Issue for Appeal filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Related document(s)[116]) (Stern, William) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Robert Dunn. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER. For the sake of the clarity and completeness of the Court's arbitration order, plaintiffs may argue for reconsideration. The request to file the reconsideration brief is granted, and the brief attached as Exhibit A to the motion for leave to file at Dkt. No. [115], is deemed filed as of today. Responses due by November 27, 2017. Replies due by December 4, 2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/13/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/5/2017, Entered: 11/5/2017, Terminated: 11/13/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration or, Alternatively, for Order Certifying Issue for Appeal filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Motion, # (2) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/5/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER re [88] Fitbit's Motion to Compel Arbitration, [86] Plaintiffs' Brief on Contract Formation Defenses to Enforcement of Arbitration Clause. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/11/2017. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                      REPLY (re [88] MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) Supplemental Brief re Meyer v. Uber Technologies and Aanderud v. Superior Court filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andrea Clisura (Clisura, Andrea) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                            REPLY (re [88] MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply Addressing Recently-Filed Authority Regarding Plaintiffs' Contract Formation Brief and Fitbit, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Order by Judge James Donato granting (108) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:16-cv-00036-JD. Plaintiffs may file a sur-reply not to exceed three pages no later than Friday, August 25, 2017. Fitbit may file supplementary briefing not to exceed three pages no later than Friday, August 25, 2017. No further submissions will be accepted. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00036-JD, 3:16-cv-00777-JD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017, Terminated: 8/21/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File A SUR-REPLY ADDRESSING RECENTLY-FILED AUTHORITY IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS' CONTRACT FORMATION BRIEF AND FITBIT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                  Statement of Recent Decision by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Meyer v. Kalanick Opinion))(Stern, William) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Fitbit, Inc. of Filing Unsealed Document Pursuant to Court Order (ECF No. 104) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bartolomeo, Kai) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                      Statement of Recent Decision by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stern, William) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/4/2017. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [102] Statement of Recent Decision by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[94]) (Stern, William) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Rob Dunn in Support of [93] Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Related document(s)[93]) (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re [88] MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) - Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Fitbit, Inc's Motion to Compel Arbitration to Address Recently-Filed Authority filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                Order granting [96] Motion for Leave to File entered by Hon. James Donato. The request to file the proposed sur-reply is granted. Plaintiffs should file it promptly. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re [96] MOTION for Leave to File - Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record and to File a Sur-Reply Addressing Recently-Filed Authority in Connection With Plaintiffs' Contract Formation Brief and Fitbit, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration ) filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [96] MOTION for Leave to File - Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record and to File a Sur-Reply Addressing Recently-Filed Authority in Connection With Plaintiffs' Contract Formation Brief and Fitbit, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration ) filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017, Terminated: 5/30/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File - Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record and to File a Sur-Reply Addressing Recently-Filed Authority in Connection With Plaintiffs' Contract Formation Brief and Fitbit, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rob Dunn in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fitbit, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Sur-Reply in Opposition to Fitbit, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration to Address Recently-Filed Authority, # (3) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The Court finds the motion to compel arbitration, Dkt. No. 88, suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for March 16, 2017, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/8/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [88] MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [86] MOTION Plaintiffs' Brief on Contract Formation Defenses to Enforcement of Arbitration Clause re [78] Motion Hearing,,, , [88] MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - McLellan Declaration, # (2) Exhibit B - Black Declaration, # (3) Exhibit C - Urban Declaration, # (4) Exhibit D - Saito Declaration, # (5) Exhibit E - Rubinstein Declaration, # (6) Exhibit F - Callan Declaration, # (7) Exhibit G - Schorr Declaration, # (8) Exhibit H - Morgan Declaration, # (9) Exhibit I - Jones Declaration, # (10) Exhibit J - Landers Declaration, # (11) Exhibit K - Burke Declaration, # (12) Exhibit L - Molenstra Declaration)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to consolidate and extend briefing on the contract formation and motion to compel arbitration issues, Dkt. No. 91, is granted. Plaintiffs will file a consolidated opposition to motion to compel and reply in support of contract formation motion on February 13, 2017. Fitbit will file its reply in support of its motion to compel on February 27, 2017. A hearing is set for March 16, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/17/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [88] MOTION to Compel Arbitration, [86] MOTION Plaintiffs' Brief on Contract Formation Defenses to Enforcement of Arbitration Clause re [78] Motion Hearing,,, filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 LETTER BRIEF
                                                                                                                                                              Letter Brief re [89] Letter Brief, Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Related document(s)[89]) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 LETTER BRIEF
                                                                                                                                                                Letter Brief re [88] MOTION to Compel Arbitration, [86] MOTION Plaintiffs' Brief on Contract Formation Defenses to Enforcement of Arbitration Clause re [78] Motion Hearing,,, filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Related document(s)[88], [86]) (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017, Terminated: 10/11/2017 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Fitbit, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/23/2017. Replies due by 1/30/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stern, William) (Filed on 1/9/2017) Modified on 10/12/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [86] MOTION Plaintiffs' Brief on Contract Formation Defenses to Enforcement of Arbitration Clause re [78] Motion Hearing,,, ) filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jay Kershner, # (2) Exhibit A (Kershner), # (3) Exhibit B (Kershner), # (4) Exhibit C (Kershner), # (5) Exhibit D (Kershner), # (6) Exhibit E (Kershner), # (7) Exhibit F (Kershner), # (8) Declaration of William Stern, # (9) Exhibit A (Stern), # (10) Exhibit B (Stern), # (11) Exhibit C (Stern), # (12) Exhibit D (Stern))(Stern, William) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016, Terminated: 10/11/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Plaintiffs' Brief on Contract Formation Defenses to Enforcement of Arbitration Clause re [78] Motion Hearing,,, filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. Responses due by 1/9/2017. Replies due by 1/17/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/12/2016) Modified on 10/12/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 discovery hearing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 12/8/2016. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-10-2016, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [80] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2017. (Related documents(s) [80]) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/10/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The telephonic hearing set for December 8, 2016, at 2:30 p.m., is advanced to December 8, 2016, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/5/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The Court will hold a telephonic discovery hearing on Thursday, December 8, 2016, at 2:30 p.m., to resolve the parties' discovery dispute, Dkt. Nos. 73, 76. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by no later than 48 hours in advance of the call to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/18/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 12/8/2016 02:30 PM before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/10/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Fitbit, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Bartolomeo, Kai) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016, Terminated: 8/4/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Gloria Lee, # (2) Declaration Erin Bosman, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) REDACTED - Exhibit A to Bosman Decl., # (5) UNREDACTED - Exhibit A to Bosman Decl.)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2016. re [73] Discovery Letter Brief filed by John Molenstra, Todd Rubinstein, Lisa Marie Burke, Judith Landers, Bruce Morgan, Rachel Saito, Rhonda Callan, Teresa Black, Robert Dunn, Kate McLellan, Amber Jones, David Urban, James Schorr, [63] MOTION for Hearing re [57] Brief, on the Application of Brennan v. Opus Bank and Next Steps filed by John Molenstra, Todd Rubinstein, Lisa Marie Burke, Judith Landers, Bruce Morgan, Rachel Saito, Rhonda Callan, Teresa Black, Robert Dunn, Kate McLellan, Amber Jones, David Urban, James Schorr Total Time in Court 33 minutes. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. The Court will take up the parties' discovery dispute, Dkt. Nos. 73, 76, at the hearing on November 10, 2016. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/7/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [73] Discovery Letter Brief by Fitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Defendant is directed to file by November 1, 2016, a response to plaintiffs' discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. 73. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/25/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016, Terminated: 12/9/2016 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery Letter Brief filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 discovery hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 10/5/2016. FTR Time 14 minutes. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re [69] Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Stern, William) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 9/28/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. Fitbit is directed to file a response to plaintiffs' discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. 69, by Monday, October 3, 2016. The response should not exceed three pages and should otherwise comply with the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. A telephonic hearing is set for Wednesday, October 5, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by no later than 48 hours in advance of the call to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/28/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016, Terminated: 10/7/2016 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery Letter Brief filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. To promote the professional development of newer attorneys, the Court invited the parties to have counsel in the first six years of practice argue the Brennan V. Opus Bank issue. Dkt. No. 65. Plaintiffs rose to the occasion by naming a fourth-year associate to handle their presentation. Counsel for defendant, Morrison & Foerster, could not propose a lawyer with less than eight years of practice. Oral argument is set for November 10, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. The Court may adjust the time allocated to each side to account for any disparity caused by defendant's selection of attorneys outside the Court's specifications. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/20/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [65] Order, Re Oral Argument on Brennan v. Opus Bank Issue by Fitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re [65] Order, by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The Court will hold oral argument on the Brennan v. Opus Bank issue if the parties agree that the argument will be handled by lawyers in their first six years of practice. The parties are directed to advise the Court of their response by September 16, 2016. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/9/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stern, William) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016, Terminated: 9/20/2016 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing re [57] Brief, on the Application of Brennan v. Opus Bank and Next Steps filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief re [57] Brief, Reply re Brennan and "Next Steps" filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Related document(s)[57]) (Stern, William) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kai Shields Bartolomeo (Bartolomeo, Kai) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [57] Brief, on the Application of Brennan v. Opus Bank and "Next Steps" by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Hon. James Donato re (58) Stipulated Protective Order. The parties' stipulated protective order is approved, except that for those provisions that conflict with the Court's Standing Orders (e.g., relating to the filing of discovery motions rather than discovery dispute letters), the Court's Standing Orders will govern. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00036-JD, 3:16-cv-00777-JD. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016, Terminated: 8/25/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief re [53] Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Re: Brennan v. Opus Bank and "Next Steps" filed byFitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[53]) (Stern, William) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on August 3, 2016, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (54 in 3:16-cv-00036-JD) Transcript Order, (55 in 3:16-cv-00036-JD) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2016. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/03/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Fitbit, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Park, Julie) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/03/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Case Management Conference - Further
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/3/2016. Motion due by 8/12/16. Responses due by 8/26/2016. Replies due by 9/2/2016.FTR Time 2:06-2:28. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2016) Modified on 8/5/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: At the case management conference on August 3, 2016, the parties should be prepared to discuss [47] Joint Discovery Letter Brief, and should be prepared to provide the Court with a copy of relevant arbitration clause language re Dkt. No. [48]. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/2/16. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James Donato granting [50] Motion Continuing Case Management Conference to August 3, 2016 at 1:30pm. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearing: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016, Terminated: 7/6/2016 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Reschedule July 13, 2016, Case Management Conference re [48] Order,,, Set Hearings,, filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. Responses due by 7/15/2016. Replies due by 7/22/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [42] Amended Complaint, CORRECTION OF DOCKET 42-1 filed byTeresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Related document(s)[42]) (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court sets a further case management conference for Wednesday, July 13, 2016 at 1:30pm in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. At the conference, the parties should be prepared to discuss the applicability, if any, of Brennan v. Opus Bank, 796 F.3d 1125, 1126 (9th Cir. 2015) and Fruth v. AGCS Marine Ins. Co., No. 15-cv-3311-JD, Dkt. No. 48 (N.D. Cal. Mar. 31, 2016) to the arbitrability of this case. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/30/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re Discovery and Briefing Schedule on Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/21/16. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion to Compel Arbitration due by 9/19/16. Responses due by 10/11/2016. Replies due by 10/25/2016. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. James Donato re [17], [43] Stipulations on Mediation: The parties may engage in private mediation to be completed no later than sixty days after the Court rules on Fitbit's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement Joint Statement Re Arbitration Discovery and Briefing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint against Fitbit, Inc.. Filed byBruce Morgan, Judith Landers, David Urban, Lisa Marie Burke, Teresa Black, Todd Rubinstein, Rhonda Callan, Kate McLellan, Rachel Saito, Amber Jones, James Schorr, Robert Dunn, John Molenstra. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Granting Leave to File Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint filed by Teresa Black, Lisa Marie Burke, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones, Judith Landers, Kate McLellan, John Molenstra, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Julie Yongsun Park (Park, Julie) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT - CONSOLIDATED MASTER CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Fitbit, Inc.. Filed byBruce Morgan, David Urban, Teresa Black, Rhonda Callan, Todd Rubinstein, Kate McLellan, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, Robert Dunn, Amber Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on April 6, 2016, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com, 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (36 in 3:16-cv-00036-JD) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2016. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/06/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Fitbit, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Park, Julie) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/06/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Kate McLellan, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING NOTICE TO RELATE CASES C-16-00036-JD MCLELLAN v. FITBIT, INC. AND C-16-151-SI ROBB v. FITBIT, INC. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Order on Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Hon. James Donato granting (31) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:16-cv-00036-JD. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00036-JD, 3:16-cv-00777-JD. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2016.FTR Time 1:38-1:55. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Fitbit, Inc. Amended (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016, Terminated: 4/7/2016 Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases - Unopposed filed by Teresa Black, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Kate McLellan, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. Responses due by 4/19/2016. Replies due by 4/26/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016, Terminated: 4/8/2016 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Relate Case DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Ryan M. Keats, # (2) Proposed Order)(White, Anna) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Park, Julie) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Teresa Black, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Kate McLellan, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Teresa Black, Rhonda Callan, Robert Dunn, Kate McLellan, Bruce Morgan, Todd Rubinstein, Rachel Saito, James Schorr, David Urban (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Urban and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Black and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Schorr and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Dunn and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Morgan and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Saito and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Callan and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff McLellan and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Rubinstein and Counsel (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016, Terminated: 6/9/2016 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Fitbit, Inc. filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Fitbit, Inc. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Erin McCalmon Bosman [for Fitbit, Inc.] (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Erin McCalmon Bosman [for Fitbit, Inc.] (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James Donato granting [11] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert H. Klonoff..(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/27/2016, Entered: 2/27/2016, Terminated: 3/2/2016 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10247893.) filed by Kate McLellan. (Klonoff, Robert) (Filed on 2/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Dermody (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2016.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/16/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/12/2016. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case REASSIGNED to Judge Hon. James Donato. Judge Hon. Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bruce Morgan, David Urban, Teresa Black, Rhonda Callan, Todd Rubinstein, Kate McLellan, Rachel Saito, Robert Dunn. Service waived by Fitbit, Inc. waiver sent on 2/4/2016, answer due 4/4/2016. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fitbit, Inc.. Filed byKate McLellan, David Urban, Teresa Black. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Fitbit, Inc.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Case Assigned by Intake
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case assigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Summons. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Fitbit, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10106709.). Filed byKate McLellan, David Urban, Teresa Black. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 771 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?