Wiedenhoeft v. Hayden
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00728-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald Vernon Wiedenhoeft, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Henault and Sysko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emile J Henault, Jr +1 410 768 9300 +1 410 553 0498
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas F Corcoran +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 Thomas.Corcoran@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 3/8/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 7/9/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Terminated Case
Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT ENTERED IN FAVOR OF Michael V. Hayden; Director of NSA; and Chief of the Central Security Service against Plaintiff Ronald Vernon Wiedenhoeft DISMISSING all claims with Prejudice without costs. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/8/02) (c/m 7/8/02 jw)(Microfilmed 7/9/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [6-1] Motion of Defendants to Dismiss, denying as Moot [6-2] Motion of Defendants for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/8/02 ) (c/m 7/8/02 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002, Terminated: 7/9/2002 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
        MOTION with memorandum in support by Michael V. Hayden for Preliminary Injunction , and Permanent Injunction with Exhibits A & 9 (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002, Terminated: 7/8/2002 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION with memorandum in support by Michael V. Hayden, USA to Dismiss , or for Summary Judgment with Exhibit A & 9 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Summons Returned Executed
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Michael V. Hayden 3/13/02 Answer due on 5/13/02 for Michael V. Hayden; US Attorney General served on 3/20/02 and U.S. Attorney served on 3/8/02. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER denying [1-1] motion by Plaintiff for Temporary Restraining Order signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 03/08/02) (c/hd 03/08/02 ls) (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin c/hd 03/08/02) (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Michael V. Hayden (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002, Terminated: 3/8/2002 Motion for TRO
                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Ronald Vernon Wiedenhoeft for Temporary Restraining Order . (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002, Terminated: 3/8/2002 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1 thru 23 filed Separately; (Note Complaint filed as EX Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1183480 (ljs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/08/2002
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 46 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?