Daniel Santiago v. Southern California Rapid Transit
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC049102

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo L.a. County Metropolitan Trans Authority, Defendant and Cross-Complainant
No Logo Southern Calfornia Rapid Transit, Defendant and Cross-Complainant
No Logo Santiago, Daniel, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Wilson Ronald N. And Associates, Atty for Defendant and Cross-Complnt
Type Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 04/22/1993
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: 10/21/1993 Notice of Change of Address
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
    Blank 6 Filed: 3/23/1993, Entered: 3/23/1993 Award-Arbitrator
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
      Blank 5 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 8/28/1992 At-issue Memorandum
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
        Blank 4 Filed: 5/20/1992, Entered: 5/20/1992 Cross Complaint
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
          Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/1992, Entered: 5/20/1992 Answer
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
            Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1992, Entered: 5/13/1992 Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
              Blank 1 Filed: 2/21/1992, Entered: 2/21/1992 Complaint
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?