Bezelik v. Hayden
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-01665-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas P. Bezelik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Henault and Sysko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emile J Henault, Jr +1 410 768 9300 +1 410 553 0498
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/10/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 3/6/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of defendant against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/5/03. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [3] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/5/03. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY by Michael V. Hayden to plaintiff's response to his [3-1] motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [8-1] motion of defendant to Extend Time to file reply in support of the motion to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment until 10/22/02 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/8/02) (c/i 10/9/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002, Terminated: 10/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
          MOTION by Michael V. Hayden to Extend Time to file reply in support of the motion to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment (hml, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE by Thomas P. Bezelik to [3-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Michael V. Hayden; Memorandum, Exhibits 5-12 and Declaration of Bezelik with Exhibits 11-17 (Entire Pleading and Exhibits FILED SEPARATELY) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [5-1] motion by Plaintiff to Extend Time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment to 9/20/02 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 9/13/02 ) (c/i 9/16/02) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002, Terminated: 9/16/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                MOTION by Thomas P. Bezelik to Extend Time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Michael V. Hayden 6/10/01; USAG 5/14/02; NSA 5/21/02 (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Michael V. Hayden for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-9 (Exhibits FILED SEPARATELY) (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Summons Issued
                      SUMMONS(60 days) issued for Michael V. Hayden (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Jury Demand
                        DEMAND for jury trial by Thomas P. Bezelik (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1-4 and Tabs filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1185376 (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/10/2002
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 40 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?