Bezelik v. Hayden
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02402-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas P. Bezelik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Henault and Sysko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emile J Henault, Jr +1 410 768 9300 +1 410 553 0498
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/19/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 4/14/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
JUDGMENT ORDER in favor of Defendant Lt. Gen. Michael V. Hayden, Director, National Security Agency against plaintiff Thomas P. Bezelik, dismissing all claims with prejudice with costs. Any and all prior rulings disposing of any claims against any parties are incorporated by reference herein. This Order shall be deemed to be a final judgment within the meaning of Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/11/03. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [6] Motion of defendant to Dismiss, granting [6] Motion of defendant for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/11/03. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Reply in Support of his Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment is extended to 1/10/03. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/15/03 ) (c/i 1/15/03) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by Michael V. Hayden to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss by Michael V. Hayden, [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Michael V. Hayden (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 1/15/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
          MOTION by Michael V. Hayden to Extend Time for Defendant to File Reply in Support of his Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response in Opposition
            RESPONSE by Thomas P. Bezelik in opposition to [6-1] motion to Dismiss by Michael V. Hayden, [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Michael V. Hayden (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [7-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to file oppositions is extended to 12/13/02. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/13/02 ) (c/i 11/13/02) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002, Terminated: 11/13/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                MOTION by Thomas P. Bezelik to Extend Time to file oppositions (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Michael V. Hayden to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment and exhibits 1-16. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion of defendant to Extend Time for 30 days to file motion to dismiss or for summary judgment is extended to 10/21/02. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 9/23/02) (c/i 9/23/02) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002, Terminated: 9/23/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION by Michael V. Hayden to Extend Time for 30 days to file motion to dismiss or for summary judgment (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Michael V. Hayden, served Director, U.S. Dept of Justice, U.S. Attorney, 7/29/02 Answer due on 9/30/02 for Michael V. Hayden (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Michael V. Hayden (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Jury Demand
                            DEMAND for jury trial by Thomas P. Bezelik (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1-39 filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1186863 (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 616 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?