Paff v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02467-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard Paff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by close-kennedy.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher P Kennedy +1 410 296 3606 +1 410 296 0080 ckennedy@close-kennedy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schochor Federico and Staton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Schochor +1 410 234 1000 +1 410 234 1010 jschochor@sfspa.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/25/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore County
Terminated 8/29/2002
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 24-C-02002319[CC-Baltimore City]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ORDER without Prejudice and "APPROVAL." "This rescinds the Order entered herein dated August 22, 2002." (Signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/29/02) (c/m 8/29/02 skp) (Microfilmed 8/29/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to substitute United States as a Defendant; DISMISSING complaint against Baltimore Medical and Emily Richie with prejudice ( signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/22/02) (c/m 8/22/02 skp) (MICROFILMED 8/22/02) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Local Rule
        Local Rule 103.5 Certification by United States RE: State Court Papers (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Summons Issued
          SUMMONS(ES) issued for Baltimore Medical, Emily Richie (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Remark
            Pleading 11 is a copy of a paper filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002, Terminated: 8/29/2002 Response
              RESPONSE by Emily Richie, Baltimore Medical to [8-1] Standing Order Concerning Removal (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER EXTENDING the time for defendant to answer complaint reset Answer deadline to 8/28/02 for Emily Richie signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 7/26/02) (c/m 7/26/02 neg) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  STANDING ORDER re: Removal ( signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m 07/26/02) (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Remark
                    Notice of Removal mailed to Parties (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002, Terminated: 8/22/2002 Motion to Substitute Party
                      MOTION by Emily Richie, Baltimore Medical to substitute United States as a Defendant and Exhibits (ljs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/26/2002
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        MOTION by United States For Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint (ljs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/26/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Local Rule
                          Local Rule 103.5 Certificate re: State Court Papers (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Defendants (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Jury Demand
                              DEMAND for jury trial by Richard Paff (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT and attachments filed; (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Notice of Removal
                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Emily Ritchie and Baltimore Medical Systems, Inc; (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Remark
                                    The above pleadings 2 through 4 are copies filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?