United States v. Jordan
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02144-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 4:49 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Gina Y. Jordan, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/26/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $1045000
Nature of Suit 152 - Contract: Defaulted Student Loan
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345 Default of Student Loan
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Baltimore County
Terminated 2/10/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
STIPULATION FOR CONSENT JUDGMENT for United States against Gina Y. Jordan DIRECTING the Defendant hereby agrees to the Entry of a consent judgment in the sum of $298,976.87 plus post judgment interest at the legal rate thereafter until paid in full as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 2/10/03 ) (c/i 2/10/03) (MICROFILMED 2/10/03) (jb-1.32%) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by United States, Gina Y. Jordan. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 7/26/02 ) (c/i 7/26/02) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002, Terminated: 2/10/2003 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint by Gina Y. Jordan. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Summons Returned Executed
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Gina Y. Jordan 6/29/02 Answer due on 7/19/02 for Gina Y. Jordan (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Summons Returned Executed
              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Gina Y. Jordan 6/29/02 Answer due on 7/19/02 for Gina Y. Jordan. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Summons Issued
                SUMMONS (20 days) issued for Gina Y. Jordan (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT and exhibits 1 thru 4 filed; (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 42 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?