Bezelik v. Hayden
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02309-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:56 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas P. Bezelik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Henault and Sysko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emile J Henault, Jr +1 410 768 9300 +1 410 553 0498
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/11/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 4/30/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of defendant Michael V. Hayden against plaintiff Thomas P. Bezelik. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/30/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [5] Motion of defendant to Dismiss, granting [5] Motion of defendant for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/30/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Telephone Conference
      Telephone Conference (Chambers) held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (hbm, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [6-1] motion by Plaintiff for Enlargement of Time to file oppositions to Defendant's Motion to dismiss or in the alternative for Summary Judgment to 12/13/02 nunc pro tunc to 11/13/02 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/14/03 ) (c/i 1/14/03) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING Motion by Defendant to extend time for filing an answer or other appropriate response to 10/21/02 nunc pro tunc to 9/23/02. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/14/03 ) (c/i 1/14/03) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY by Michael V. Hayden to plaintiff's response to his [5-1] motion to Dismiss and his [5-2] motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [9-1] motion of defendant Hayden for Enlargement of Time to file reply in support of defendant's motion to dismiss, or in alternative motion for summary judgment to 1/10/03. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 12/27/02) (c/i 12/27/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 12/27/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                MOTION by Michael V. Hayden for Enlargement of Time to file reply in support of defendant's motion to dismiss, or in the alternative motion for summary judgment (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION by Michael V. Hayden for Enlargement of Time to file a reply in support of defendant's motion to dismiss, or in the alternative motion for summary judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response in Opposition
                    RESPONSE by Thomas P. Bezelik in opposition to [5-1] motion to Dismiss by Michael V. Hayden, [5-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Michael V. Hayden and Memorandum (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002, Terminated: 1/14/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION by Thomas P. Bezelik for Enlargement of Time to file oppositions (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Michael V. Hayden to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1 through 16 (c/s) (EXHIBITS FILED SEPARATELY) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/22/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          MOTION by Michael V. Hayden for Enlargement of Time to file a motion to dismiss, or in the alternative summary judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Michael V. Hayden 7/17/02, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney Gen. 7/17/02, Answer due on 9/16/02 for Michael V. Hayden (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Summons Issued
                              SUMMONS (60 days) issued for Michael V. Hayden (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Jury Demand
                                DEMAND for jury trial by Thomas P. Bezelik (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT and exhibits 1 thru 51 filed (Exhibits filed separately); FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1186714 (nrm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/12/2002
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?