Maryland Medical, et al v. United States Postal, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02917-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Doriscine Colley, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martina Deanne Evans +1 410 323 1958 +1 410 366 7605 MEvansAtty@aol.com
No Logo Maryland Medical Rehabilitation, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Erwin L. Greenberg Commerical Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fedder and Garten PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira L. Oring +1 410 539 2800 +1 410 659 0543 ilo@fedgar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFIT KURMAN YUMKAS AND DENICK PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex Matthew Allman +1 443 738 1500 +1 443 738 1535 aallman@offitlaw.com
No Logo Philip R. Lamb & Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karpinski Colaresi and Karp PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Bock Karpinski +1 410 727 5000 +1 410 727 0861 bkcklaw@aol.com
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/4/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $100517000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore County
Terminated 5/9/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, MAG-S
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
Settlement Conference held before Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Referral TERMINATED. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs otherwise agreed without predudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated within 65 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/6/03. (c/m & Microfilmed 5/7/03 ms)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      PAPERLESS ORDER in response to letter request from defense counsel. Ordered: Attorneys with full settlement authority to attend [settlement conference on May 6, 2003]. Program Rep MUST be available by telephone. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 05/01/03. (Bredar, James)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [26-1] Letter/Motion of Defendant Philip R. Lamb and Company, Inc. Requesting Court to Excuse Defendant from Settlement Conference. "Request Denied. All named parties and counsel to be present." (signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 2/4/03) (c/m 2/4/03 cw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          LETTER/MOTION by Philip R. Lamb & Co. Requesting Court to Excuse Defendant from Settlement Conference (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER SCHEDULING date for Settlement Conference. (signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 1/24/03) (c/m 1/27/03 cw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar to conduct Alternate Dispute Resolution in attempt to assist parties to reach a Settlement. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/14/03) (c/m 1/17/03 hsg) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [22-1] Motion of Defendant to Extend Time, granting [22-2] Motion of Defendant to Stay for Purposes of Pursuing Settlement Discussions and REFERRING case to Magistrate Judge for Mediation and STAYING all litigation pending the completion of said mediation process. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/16/03) (c/i 1/17/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003, Terminated: 1/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION by United States Postal to Extend Time , or in the Alternative to Stay for Purposes of Pursuing Settlement Discussions (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER CORRECTING Memorandum and Order issued 1/6/03 to reflect: "Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Greenberg Commercial is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. All Claims against Defendant GCC in Counts I and II are DISMISSED. The claims against Defendant GCC in Counts III, IV, V and VI remain pending. Defendant GCC shall Answer Counts III, IV, V and VI and by 1/24/03 Plaintiffs shall show cause why all claims by Plaintiffs Brown and Colley should not be dismissed. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/14/03) (c/i 1/14/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part [8-1] Motion of Defendant to Dismiss Complaint against Defendant Greenberg; all claims against Defendant GCC in Counts I, II and III are DISMISSED; claims in Counts IV, V and VI remain pending and Counts IV, V and VI shall be answered by Defendant. Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to show cause why all claims by Plaintiffs Brown and Colley should not be dismissed. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/6/03) (c/i 1/6/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [18-1] Motion of Defendant to Extend Time for Purposes of Pursuing Settlement Discussions ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 12/17/02) (c/i 12/18/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002, Terminated: 12/18/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          MOTION by United States Postal to Extend Time for Purposes of Pursuing Settlement Discussions (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [16-1] Unopposed Motion of Defendant to Extend Time to Answer Complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/16/02 for United States Postal ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/4/02) (c/i 11/4/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/4/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              UNOPPOSED MOTION by United States Postal to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Local Rule
                                Local Rule 103.5 Certification of Filing of State Court Papers filed in US District Court by United States Postal Service (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Philip R. Lamb & Co. (Attorney Kevin Bock Karpinski) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Erwin L. Greenberg 8/1/02 (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Remark
                                      Pleadings 13 & 14 are copies of the original pleading filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore County. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Response in Opposition
                                        RESPONSE by Maryland Medical, Doriscine Colley, Kenneth Brown in opposition to [8-1] Motion of Defendant Greenberg to Dismiss Complaint against Defendant Greenberg (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [6-1] Motion of Defendant for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint reset Answer deadline to 11/1/02 for Philip R. Lamb & Co., for Erwin L. Greenberg, for United States Postal ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 9/19/02) (c/m 9/20/02 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Response
                                            RESPONSE by United States Postal to [7-1] Standing Order re Removal (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM by Maryland Medical, Doriscine Colley, Kenneth Brown in opposition to [8-1] Motion to Dismiss Complaint against Defendant Greenberg with Exhibit and Affidavit (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002, Terminated: 1/6/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Erwin L. Greenberg to Dismiss Complaint against Defendant Greenberg (filed by Plaintiff's counsel) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Remark
                                                  Pleading #8 above is a copy of the original pleading filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore County (removed to this Court by Plaintiff) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    STANDING ORDER re: Removals assigned to Judge Garbis ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 09/04/02 nm) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002, Terminated: 9/20/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                      MOTION by United States Postal for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint . (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Local Rule
                                                        Local Rule 103.5 Certification Re: State Court Papers filed the by United States Postal. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE of filing Notice of removal by United States Postal (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Summons Issued
                                                            SUMMONS issued for United States Postal (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Jury Demand
                                                              DEMAND for jury trial by Maryland Medical, Doriscine Colley, Kenneth Brown (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT filed; (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Notice of Removal
                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by defendant United States Postal Service; (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Remark
                                                                    ABOVE PLEADINGS ARE ALL COPIES OF PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE, COUNTY MARYLAND. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?