Logan v. Ledo Pizza System, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-03871-AMD
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Suzan M. Logan, Plaintiff

Represented by Severn OConnor and Kresslein PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Rose, Jr +1 301 682 9840 +1 301 682 9225 prose@fredericklaw.com

Represented by Thatcher Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Hitt Thatcher +1 301 441 1400 +1 301 441 9602 lht@thatcherlaw.com
No Logo Kirsten, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by COUNCIL, BARADEL, KOSMERL & NOLAN, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Stobbart Shapiro +1 410 269 6190 +1 410 269 8409 Shapiro@cbknlaw.com
No Logo Paul A. Sellers, III, Counter-Claimant

Represented by COUNCIL, BARADEL, KOSMERL & NOLAN, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Stobbart Shapiro +1 410 269 6190 +1 410 269 8409 Shapiro@cbknlaw.com
v.
No Logo Kirsten, Inc., Defendant

Represented by COUNCIL, BARADEL, KOSMERL & NOLAN, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Stobbart Shapiro +1 410 269 6190 +1 410 269 8409 Shapiro@cbknlaw.com
No Logo Ledo Pizza System, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
No Logo Paul A. Sellers, III, Defendant

Represented by COUNCIL, BARADEL, KOSMERL & NOLAN, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Stobbart Shapiro +1 410 269 6190 +1 410 269 8409 Shapiro@cbknlaw.com
No Logo Suzan M. Logan, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Severn OConnor and Kresslein PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Rose, Jr +1 301 682 9840 +1 301 682 9225 prose@fredericklaw.com

Represented by Thatcher Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Hitt Thatcher +1 301 441 1400 +1 301 441 9602 lht@thatcherlaw.com
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/27/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Unknown
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Calvert
Terminated 3/17/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, MAG-S
Timeline
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on April 15, 2003. (Judge Davis)
LREF
Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Suzan M. Logan. (Thatcher, Linda)
LREF
Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs otherwise agreed without predudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 3/17/03. (MICROFILMED 3/17/03) (c/m 3/17/03 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, Setting a Settlement Conference. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K. Schulze 2/10/03) (c/m jw) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jillyn K. Schulze for Settlement or Other ADR Conference ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis ) (c/m 1/28/03 pf) (pkf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that the Counterclaim asserted by defendants Kirsten, Inc., and Paul A. Sellers, III, is Dismissed without prejudice, and Ordered that defendant Ledo Pizza System, Inc., shall promptly produce the relevant franchise agreement and shall cooperate in the early scheduling of its Rule 30(b)(6) deposition in advance of mediation, and Ordered that the parties shall participate in good faith in mediation before a United States Magistrate Judge. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 1/23/03) (c/i 1/23/03) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Scheduling Conference
Scheduling conference held before (Davis,J) (Counsel for Ledo Pizza System Inc., Mr. Lynch via telephone) Oral opinion rendered by the Court dismissing counterclaim, directing 30(b)(6) discovery, referring parties to ADR before Magistrate Judge in Southern Disivision with status to follow ADR (Court to issue order) (Reporter: S. Cook) (bma, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Response
RESPONSE by Suzan M. Logan to [6-1] counter claim by Paul A. Sellers III, Kirsten, Inc. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, that an on the record scheduling conference has been scheduled for 1/23/03. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 1/2/03 ) (c/i 1/2/03) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by Ledo Pizza System (Attorney John Paul Lynch) (c/s) (rec'd in GB 12/26/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Ledo Pizza System (c/s) (rec'd in GB 12/26/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/27/2002
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 by Kirsten, Inc., Paul A. Sellers III (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Counterclaim
COUNTERCLAIM by Kirsten, Inc., Paul A. Sellers III against Suzan M. Logan (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/23/2002
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by Kirsten, Inc., Paul A. Sellers III (Attorney Susan Stobbart Shapiro), (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Ledo Pizza System, Kirsten, Inc., Paul A. Sellers III 12/4/02 Answer due on 12/24/02 for Paul A. Sellers III, for Kirsten, Inc., for Ledo Pizza System (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 by Suzan M. Logan (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Ledo Pizza System, Kirsten, Inc., Paul A. Sellers III (elt, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Suzan M. Logan (elt, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 2289748 (elt, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 80 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?