Bellboy Import v. Horn
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-03077-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bellboy Import Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Adelberg Rudow Dorf and Hendler LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M Kline +1 410 539 5195 +1 410 539 5834 gkline@adelbergrudow.com
Space Andrew Radding +1 410 539 5195 +1 410 539 5834 aradding@adelbergrudow.com
No Logo Vivian Van Horn, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen B Caplis +1 410 347 8700 +1 410 752 7092 scaplis@wtplaw.com
v.
No Logo Vivian Van Horn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen B Caplis +1 410 347 8700 +1 410 752 7092 scaplis@wtplaw.com
No Logo Bellboy Import Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adelberg Rudow Dorf and Hendler LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M Kline +1 410 539 5195 +1 410 539 5834 gkline@adelbergrudow.com
Space Andrew Radding +1 410 539 5195 +1 410 539 5834 aradding@adelbergrudow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CARR MALONEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Maloney +1 202 310 5500 +1 202 310 5555 pjm@carrmaloney.com
No Logo Martin Bell, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CARR MALONEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Maloney +1 202 310 5500 +1 202 310 5555 pjm@carrmaloney.com
No Logo Vivian Van Horn, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen B Caplis +1 410 347 8700 +1 410 752 7092 scaplis@wtplaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/17/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 3/16/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 OrderCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING [53] Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Vivian Van Horn. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 3/16/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal Line of Dismissal with prejudice to all claims, counterclaims and third-party claims by Vivian Van Horn, Vivian Van Horn, Vivian Van Horn. (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
      LREF
      Legal Document 52 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Miscellaneous Correspondence
      Correspondence re: April 8, 2005 PreTrial Conference (Kline, Gregory)
        LREF
        Legal Document 51 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Miscellaneous Correspondence
        Joint Correspondence re: Anticipated Duration of Trial (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
          LREF
          Legal Document 50 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J Maloney (Maloney, Paul)
            LREF
            Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER SETTING schedule before trial. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 12/23/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Status Report Submitted
              Status Report Submitted by Vivian Van Horn (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                LREF
                Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                ORDER denying [37] Motion of Bellboy for Summary Judgment, denying AS MOOT [38] Motion of Van Horn to Preclude Affirmative Defenses, granting in part and denying in part [39] Motion of Van Horn for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/30/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/30/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                    Settlement Conference held before Judge Beth P. Gesner. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Add and Terminate Judges
                      Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to case. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Memorandum
                        Memorandum re [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vivian Van Horn. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. No. 1# (2) Exhibit Exh. No. 2# (3) Exhibit Exh. No. 3)(Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [37] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bellboy Import Corporation. (Kline, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
                            RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bellboy Import Corporation. Replies due by 10/20/2003. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 11/22/02 Hearing Testimony# (2) Exhibit Affidavit of Martin Bell# (3) Exhibit Document related to shipment Z7898# (4) Exhibit Documents related to shipment Z7899# (5) Exhibit 6/7/00 letter# (6) Exhibit 4/28/00 Letter# (7) Exhibit 6/19/00 letter# (8) Exhibit 6/23/00 Letter# (9) Exhibit Responses to Requests for Admission# (10) Exhibit 1/17/00 E-Mail# (11) Exhibit 4/8/00 E-mail# (12) Exhibit 6/12/00 Letter# (13) Exhibit Resignation Letter of Vivian Van Horn# (14) Exhibit Expense Report# (15) Exhibit 1999 Tax Return of Vivian Van Horn# (16) Exhibit Documents comparing insurance costs and customer billing# (17) Exhibit Affidavit of Leonard Juster, Esq.# (18) Exhibit Affidavit of Kimberly Heinzen# (19) Appendix Exhibit List)(Kline, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
                              RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff Van Horn's Motion to Preclude Affirmative Defenses for Failure to Provide Discovery filed by Bellboy Import Corporation. Replies due by 10/6/2003. (Maloney, Paul)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE to Motion re [37] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vivian Van Horn. Replies due by 10/2/2003. (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Vivian Van Horn. Responses due by 9/19/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# (2) Exhibit Depo of Vivian Ng VanHorn 3/18/03# (3) Exhibit Affidavit #2 of Michael Imgarten 5/16/03# (4) Exhibit Martin Bell Depo 1/7/03# (5) Exhibit Michael Imgarten Affidavit 2/13/03# (6) Exhibit Van Horn Employment App.# (7) Exhibit Michael Imgarten Depo. 4/10/03# (8) Exhibit 1/17/00 Email# (9) Exhibit 2/7/00 Memo# (10) Exhibit Emails# (11) Exhibit 4/14/00 Letter# (12) Exhibit 4/14/00 Letter# (13) Exhibit 5/4/00 Letter# (14) Exhibit 6/8/00 Memo# (15) Exhibit 6/12/00 Letter# (16) Exhibit 7/20/00 Letter# (17) Exhibit 4/25/00 & 4/28/00 Letters# (18) Exhibit 9/7/00 Memo# (19) Exhibit Email - doc. # VH0250# (20) Exhibit 6/8/00 Letter# (21) Exhibit 6/7/00 Letter# (22) Exhibit 6/19/00 Letter# (23) Exhibit 6/15/00 SWIFT Message# (24) Exhibit 6/23/00 Letter# (25) Exhibit 7/8/00 SWIFT Message# (26) Exhibit 7/7/00 Letter# (27) Exhibit 7/21/00 Letter# (28) Exhibit 8/16/00 Email# (29) Exhibit 8/16/00 letter# (30) Exhibit Doc. # UH485# (31) Exhibit 7/17/03 Depo of Britton VanHorn# (32) Exhibit Expense Report# (33) Exhibit Affidavit of Francis Brocato# (34) Exhibit 11/03/00 Letter# (35) Exhibit 1/8/03 Letter# (36) Exhibit Bellboy v. Banghart Complaint# (37) Exhibit Bellboy's Response to Interrogatories & Document Requests)(Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION Counter-Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Affirmative Defenses for Failure to Provide Discovery & Motion for Leave to File Motion to Preclude Affirmative Defenses for Failure to Provide Discovery by Vivian Van Horn. Responses due by 9/19/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiff# (2) Exhibit Counter-Def./Plaintiff's Answer to Counterclaim# (3) Exhibit 4/14/03 Letter to Andrew Radding & Paul Maloney# (4) Exhibit 7/24/03 Letter to Paul Maloney# (5) Exhibit 8/7/03 Letter to Emily Vandergrift# (6) Exhibit 8/12/03 Fax from Emily Vandergrift)(Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bellboy Import Corporation. Responses due by 9/19/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# (2) Notice of Lengthy Exhibit)(Kline, Gregory)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Vivian Van Horn. (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE by Vivian Van Horn of Service of Answers to Counter-Defendant/Plaintiff Bellboy Import Corporation and Third-Party Defendant Martin Bell's Interrogatories and Response to Third-Party Defendant Martin Bell's Request for Production of Documents (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                          ANSWER to Third Party Complaint [5] by Martin Bell.(Maloney, Paul) Modified on 6/26/2003 (mms, Deputy Clerk).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER SETTING date for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/24/03. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement or other ADR Conference. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 6/20/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [12] Motion of Third Party Defendant for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, granting in part and denying in part [13] Motion of Third Party Defendant for Extension of Time to File, granting in part and denying in part [14] Motion of Plaintiff Bellboy Import to Enforce Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 6/17/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [22] Motion of Third Party Defendant Martin Bell to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 6/17/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Correcting earlier submission
                                                    Correcting Earlier Submission (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [22] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Martin Bell. (Maloney, Paul)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to Third Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Vivian Van Horn. Replies due by 6/10/2003. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice of Lengthy Exh. No. 1# (2) Exhibit Notice of Lengthy Exh. No. 2# (3) Exhibit Jan. 17, 2000 E-mail# (4) Exhibit Notice of Lengthy Exh. No. 4# (5) Exhibit Feb. 7, 2000 Memo# (6) Exhibit June 8, 2000 Memo# (7) Exhibit June 12, 2000 Letter# (8) Exhibit Sept. 7, 2000 Memo# (9) Exhibit June 8, 2000 Letter# (10) Exhibit June 7, 2000 Letter# (11) Exhibit June 19, 2000 Letter# (12) Exhibit June 15, 2000 SWIFT Message# (13) Exhibit June 23, 2000 Letter# (14) Exhibit Aug. 16, 2000 E-mail# (15) Exhibit Expense Report# (16) Exhibit Nov. 3, 2000 Letter# (17) Exhibit Jan. 8, 2003 Letter# (18) Exhibit May 29, 2002 Fax/Memo# (19) Exhibit Application for Employment)(Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE by Vivian Van Horn Notice of Service of Responses to Requests for Admission (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [14] MOTION to Enforce Subpoena filed by Bellboy Import Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 - Deposition of Michael Imgarten# (2) Exhibit Ex. 2 - Dep. of Vivian Van Horn# (3) Exhibit Ex. 3 - Report of Special Master)(Kline, Gregory)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                                            Correspondence re: Response to Paul Maloney's 5/9/03 letter re: pending Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                                              Correspondence re: Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery (Maloney, Paul)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Martin Bell. Responses due by 5/27/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Martin Bell# (2) Exhibit A to Affidavit of Martin Bell# (3) Exhibit Scheduling Order)(Maloney, Paul)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [19] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] Third Party Complaint Responses due by 5/19/2003 Replies due by 5/30/2003.. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 05/02/2003. (Legg, Benson)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [14] MOTION to Enforce Subpoena filed by Michael Imgarten. Replies due by 5/15/2003. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Deposition of Michael Imgarten)(Wyand, David)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003, Terminated: 5/2/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] Third Party Complaint by Martin Bell. Responses due by 5/19/2003 (Maloney, Paul)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER/MEMORANDUM TO COUNSEL DIRECTING Mr. Maloney to submit a letter to the Court with copies to opposing counsel outlining the details regarding his request for extension of discovery; and DIRECTING the parties to jointly submit a letter addressing the time of the Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 4/29/03. (c/scanned/mailed 4/29/03 ms)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Motion for Extension of Discovery filed by Vivian Van Horn. Replies due by 5/9/2003. (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE by Bellboy Import Corporation of service of discovery (Kline, Gregory)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Affidavit of Service
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint Answer of Counter-Defendant/Plaintiff Bellboy Import Corporation to Counterclaim of Counter-Plaintiff/Defendant Vivian Van Horn; Notice of Service of Discovery (02/27/03); Notice of Service (02/24/03); Notice of Service of Discovery (02/11/03); Notice of Service of Discovery (12/23/02); Scheduling Order; Notice of Service (11/12/02); Notice of Deposition of Custodian of Records; Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition; Answer to Complaint; Civil Docket, Civil Cover Sheet; Waiver of Service of Summons, Summons, Complaint served on Martin Bell, Personally on 04/10/03, filed by Vivian Van Horn. (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Motion to Enforce
                                                                                MOTION to Enforce Subpoena by Bellboy Import Corporation. Responses due by 5/2/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Subpoena to Michael Imgarten# (2) Exhibit B - Objections to Subpoena# (3) Exhibit C - Defendant's Answers to Interrogatories)(Kline, Gregory)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery by Bellboy Import Corporation. Responses due by 5/1/2003 (Maloney, Paul)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bellboy Import Corporation. Responses due by 5/1/2003 (Maloney, Paul) Modified on 4/14/2003 (filed in error per Paul Maloney)(cag, Deputy Clerk).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    NOTICE by Bellboy Import Corporation of Entry and Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel (Maloney, Paul)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE by Bellboy Import Corporation of service of discovery (Kline, Gregory)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE by Bellboy Import Corporation of service of discovery (Kline, Gregory)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                          NOTICE by Vivian Van Horn Of Service of Second Set of Interrogatories (Leahy-Fucheck, Andrea)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE by Bellboy Import Corporation Demand for Jury Trial (Kline, Gregory)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim by Bellboy Import Corporation.(Kline, Gregory)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Vivian Van Horn against Martin Bell (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Counterclaim
                                                                                                  COUNTERCLAIM by Vivian Van Horn against Bellboy Import (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 12/3/02) (c/i 12/4/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Answer
                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Vivian Van Horn (Attorney Stephen B. Caplis, Andrea Leahy-Fucheck) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                                        SUMMONS (30 days) issued for Vivian Van Horn (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Jury Demand
                                                                                                          DEMAND for jury trial by Bellboy Import (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1188608 (nrm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/18/2002
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?