John Cassese, et al v. Edward Ivari, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC094360

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cassese John, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Weidmann Mark Law Offices Of

No Logo Elliott, Michael, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Weidmann Mark Law Offices Of

No Logo Fielder Stacey, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Weidmann Mark Law Offices Of

No Logo Parkhurst Ashley, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Weidmann Mark Law Offices Of

No Logo International Capillaire, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ivari Amir, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ivari Centre, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ivari Edward, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ivari International, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Ivari International"
No Logo Serafi Sheila, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ivari Centre International Capillaire, Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Type Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)
Status Verdict 03/19/1997
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/5/1997 Request For Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT
    Blank 43 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997 Notice to Prepare Clerk Transcript
      Blank 42 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997 Notice to Prepare Clerk Transcript
        Blank 41 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Notice of Appeal
          Blank 40 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 Opposition Document
          TO MOTION FOR ATTYS' FEES.
            Blank 39 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Points and Authorities
              Blank 38 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997 Notice
              OF RULING.
                Blank 37 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997 Stipulation and Order
                REGARDING FILING DATES FOR PLTFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL.
                  Blank 36 Filed: 4/23/1997, Entered: 4/23/1997 Notice
                  of ruling
                    Blank 35 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Notice
                    To prepare court reporter's transcript.
                      Blank 34 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Memo Of Costs
                        Blank 33 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 Judgment*
                        On Jury verdict.
                          Blank 32 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Request and Entry of Dismissal
                          WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff John Cassese's tenth cause of action for intentional infliction of emotional distress only!
                            Blank 31 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Points and Authorities
                              Blank 30 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Request and Entry of Dismissal
                              with prejudice. Does 1-50 from complaint.
                                Blank 29 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Opposition Document
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Declaration
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Reply/Response
                                    TO OPPO. TO MOTION.
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Reply/Response
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Proof of Service
                                        Corrected,
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Opposition Document
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997 Opposition Document
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Request For Dismissal
                                              WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT AS TO ASHLEY PARKHURST ONLY.
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 Complaint
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/17/1997 Opposition Document
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Notice
                                                    To attend trial.
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/7/1997 Notice
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 11/26/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 Opposition Document
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996 Substitution of Attorney
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Notice Of Pending Action
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Notice
                                                                OF LODGMENT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 9/18/1996, Entered: 9/18/1996 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Request For Dismissal
                                                                    With prejudice; Complaint of plaintiffs Michael Elliott abnd Stacey Fielder only
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996 Proof of Service
                                                                        proof of service by mail; substitution of attorney
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995 Proof of Service
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Statement-Non-Agreement
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Proof of Service
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994 Answer
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994 Cross Complaint
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 2/14/1994 Answer
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 Complaint

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?