Chopp & Company, Inc, et al v. Maryland KC Inc, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-03095-WMN
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Chopp & Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Braude & Margulies, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gina Jun +1 202 471 5400 +1 202 471 5404 gjun@braudemargulies.com

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
No Logo United States of America for the use of Chopp & Company, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Maryland K.C. Incorporated, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Elizabeth Mays +1 301 464 3900 +1 301 464 7357

Represented by Robert H Law Iii

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Herman Law +1 914 273 5125 +1 301 464 7357
No Logo Meltech Corporation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Melvin G. Price, Jr., Defendant
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/19/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $36000
Nature of Suit 130 - Contract - Surety
Cause
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Charles
Terminated 1/7/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to Maryland KC Inc, Meltech Corporation, Melvin G. Price Jr. and APPROVAL (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 1/7/03) (c/i & microfilmed 1/7/03) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Terminated Case
Case closed (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to USF&G Company and APPROVAL (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 12/31/02) (c/f 12/31/02) (microfilmed 1/2/03) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff file and serve on Melvin G. Price, Jr., a motion for default and default judgment or provided a report why such motions would be inappropriate, within 14 days of this Order ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 12/30/02) (c/i 12/30/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER STAYING this action as to defendant Maryland K.C. only ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 12/20/02) (c/i 12/20/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Clerks Entry of Default*
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Meltech Corporation granting [13-1] motion of plaintiff for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Meltech Corporation (c/m 12/19/02 mjl (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION by Chopp & Company, Inc, Chopp & Company for Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Meltech Corporation and Exhibit A (c/s CRD) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DIRECTING any party show cause within 7 days of the date of this letter why an Order staying case should not be entered ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 12/12/02) (c/m 12/12/02 chambers) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by Chopp & Company, Inc in opposition to [10-1] motion to Dismiss or in the alternative [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Maryland KC Inc (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Maryland KC Inc to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure by US Fidelity (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002, Terminated: 1/7/2003 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by US Fidelity (Attorney Cynthia E. Rodgers-Waire) (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Maryland KC Inc 10/15/02 Answer due on 11/4/02 for Maryland KC Inc (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Meltech Corporation 10/6/02 Answer due on 10/28/02 for Meltech Corporation (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Melvin G. Price Jr. 10/6/02 Answer due on 10/28/02 for Melvin G. Price Jr. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to US Fidelity 10/3/02 Answer due on 10/23/02 for US Fidelity (hml, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Chopp & Company, Inc. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Maryland KC Inc, Meltech Corporation, Melvin G. Price Jr., US Fidelity (elt, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Complaint
COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1 through 21 filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 2288929 (elt, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 52 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?