Eshelman v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-04023-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:23 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth Eshelman, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin Eshelman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Seldon and Scillieri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher P Brown +1 410 787 1880 +1 410 768 8115 bglaw@speakeasy.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 12/12/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $20000000
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 3/24/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Remark
CERTIFIED Copy of Order, Docket Entries and all original papers on file mailed to United States District Court Middle District of Tennessee. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [3] Motion to Dismiss, granting [3] Motion to Transfer Case and TRANSFERRING this case to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 03/24/03. (c/m 3/24/03-jlb) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
      Correspondence from Clerk RE: CM/ECF Warning Letter (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to [3] Motion to Dismiss or in the anternative Motion to Transfer Case filed by Elizabeth Eshelman, Kevin Eshelman. (c/s) Replies due by 4/1/2003. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Summons Returned Executed
          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA 12/20/02; as to Attorney General and U.S. Attorney. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003, Terminated: 3/24/2003 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION with memorandum in support by USA to Dismiss , or in the Alternative to Transfer for Improper Venue . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Summons Issued
              SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA (raf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Complaint
                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1190724 (raf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 73 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?