United States v. Warren Blount
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-cr-00004-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 4:52 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Michael Wolff +1 301 344 4434 +1 301 344 4516

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Baltimore
Filed 1/2/2003
County Baltimore City
Terminated 4/8/2004
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21846 - Conspiracy to Possess with Intent to Distribute Narcotics
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) - Possession with Intent to Distribute Narcotics; 182 - Aiding and Abetting
Count 1s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846 CONSPIRACY TO POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE NARCOTICS
Count 2s-3s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841 POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE NARCOTICS; 182 AIDING AND ABETTING
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CUSTAPP
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 161 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/11/08. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 158 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) dismissing cross appeal as to Donnell Pierce (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 157 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 USCA Order
      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) "Granting" motion to dismiss the Cross appeal pursuant to rule 42(b) as to Donnell Pierce and Warren Blount (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 156 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 USCA Order
        ORDER of USCA (certified copy)"Consolidating" case no. 07-4923, 07-4924, as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce re [152] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [153] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [144] Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release, [143] Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 155 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 USCA Order
          ORDER of USCA (certified copy)"Consolidating" these cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument as therein set forth as to Donnell Pierce, Benjamin Brown re [153] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [143] Notice of Appeal - (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 154 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 USCA Order
            ORDER of USCA (certified copy) "Consolidating" these cases (07-4923 & 07-4997)for purpose of briefing and oral argument as therein set forth as to Warren Blount, USA re [144] Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release, [152] Notice of Appeal - (nrm, Deputy Clerk) .
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 USCA Case Number
              USCA Case Number as to Donnell Pierce 07-4998 for [153] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Donnell Pierce. (case manager Sue Nagle) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to USA to US Court of Appeals re [153] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 153 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA re: September 12, 2007, downward departure and variance and the resulting sentence and Judgment in a Criminal Case (nrm, Deputy Clerk).
                    LREF
                    Blank 150 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 USCA Order
                    ORDER of USCA (certified copy) "Appointing" Gary A. Ticknor as counsel for the appellant as to Donnell Pierce re [143] Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 USCA Case Number
                      USCA Case Number as to Donnell Pierce 07-4924 for [143] Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release filed by Donnell Pierce. (Case manager Sue Nagle) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                        AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Donnell Pierce (2), Count(s) 1, 2, Dismissed; Count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s: IMPRISONMENT for a total term of two hundred thirty-five (235) months as to Count 1, two hundred thirty-five (235) months as to Count 2, and two hundred thirty-five (235) months as to Count 3, to run concurrently; SUPERVISED RELEASE for a term of three (3) years as to Count 1, three (3) years as to Count 2, and three (3) years as to Count 3, to run concurrently; ASSESSMENT of $300.00. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 9/18/07. (c/m cc: USM 9/20/07 mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                          Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to Donnell Pierce to US Court of Appeals re [143] Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 143 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL re: resentencing after remand under the sentencing reform act and its amendments as interpreted, entered in this action on or about 9/12/07 by Donnell Pierce as to [141] Order (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Sentencing
                              Re-Sentencing after remand as to Warren Blount and Donnell Pierce held on 9/12/2007 before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter Martin Giordano.) (rhl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 141 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER DIRECTING that the re-sentencing herein is deferred until scheduled by further Order as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/12/07. (c/m Chambers 3/12/07 mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Sentencing
                                  Sentencing as to Warren Blount and Donnell Pierce held on 3/9/2007 before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. Sentencing continued by agreement of parties and the court, to be rescheduled by parties. (Court Reporter J. Sovich.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 140 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Sentencing Memorandum
                                    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce. (c/s mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Sealed Document +
                                      Sealed Document. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 135 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 CJA 20 Appointment
                                        CJA 20 as to Donnell Pierce: Appointment of Attorney Gary Allen Ticknor for Donnell Pierce. Signed by Donna P. Shearer on 8/25/06. (c/m DPS 11/7/06 mcb, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 134 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 USCA Mandate
                                          MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 133 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 USCA Judgment
                                            JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce re [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 130 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 USCA Mandate
                                              MANDATE of USCA as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment and [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 129 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 USCA Order
                                                ORDER of USCA (certified copy) dismissing the appeals pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (USCA Nos. 04-4431 and 04-4432) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 Certificate of Clerk
                                                  Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT filed as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce for dates of 1/14/04 before Judge Garbis, re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Court Reporter: Jackie Sovich. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT filed as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce for dates of 3/30/04 before Judge Garbis, re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Court Reporter: Sharon Cook. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT filed as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce for dates of 4/8/04 before Judge Garbis, re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Court Reporter: Sharon Cook. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT filed as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce for dates of 1/7/04 before Judge Garbis, re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Court Reporter: Sharon Cook. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 USCA Order
                                                            ORDER of USCA (certified copy)"APPOINTING" Gary A. Ticknor as counsel as to Donnell Pierce re [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 USCA Order
                                                              ORDER of USCA (certified copy) "CONSOLIDATING" USCA case nos. 04-4332, 04-4333, 04-4431 and 04-4432 for purposes of briefing and oral argument as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/12/2004 (sls, Deputy Clerk). (Case Manager: Richard Sewell)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 USCA Case Number
                                                                USCA Case Number as to Donnell Pierce 04-4431 Consolidated with 04-4332 for [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by USA. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT filed as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce for dates of 1/6/04 before Judge Garbis, re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                                    Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce to US Court of Appeals re [113] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [114] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                      NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by USA as to Donnell Pierce re [107] Judgment. (filing fee not required) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 USCA Order
                                                                        ORDER of USCA (certified copy) APPOINTING Gary A. Ticknor pursusant to CJA as to Donnell Pierce re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 USCA Order
                                                                          ORDER of USCA (certified copy) CONSOLIDATING cases 04-4332 and 04-4333 for purposes of briefing and oral argument as therein set forth, as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [109] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 USCA Case Number
                                                                            USCA Case Number as to Donnell Pierce 04-4332 for [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Donnell Pierce, Case Administrator- R.Sewell. (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2005 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                                              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to Donnell Pierce to US Court of Appeals re [108] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by Donnell Pierce re [107] Judgment,(Appeal rec'd 4/14/04) (IFP/CJA) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                  JUDGMENT as to Donnell Pierce (2), Count(s) 1, 2, Dismissed; Count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, Imprisonment for a total term of 360 months as to count 1, 360 months as to count 2 and 360 months as to count 3 to run concurrently; Supervised Release for a term of 3 years as to count 1, 3 years as to count 2 and 3 years as to count 3 to run concurrently; Assessment $300.00. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/5/04. (c/m 5/6/04 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2005 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 In Chambers Conference
                                                                                    In Chambers Conference as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held on 1/7/2004 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: Sharon Cook. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL UNDER THE CJA, G. Arthur Robbins, Esquire is hereby appointed to represent Warren Blount and Marc Zayon, Esquire is released from the representation as to Warren Blount, and Gary Ticknor, Esquire is hereby appointed as counsel to represent Donnell Pierce and Andrew Alperstein, Esquire is released from the representation as to Donnell Pierce. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/12/04. (c/m Chambers 4/12/04 jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                          Attorney update in case as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce. Attorney G Arthur Robbins for Warren Blount, Gary Allen Ticknor for Donnell Pierce added. Attorney Andrew Ira Alperstein and Marc L Zayon terminated. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER FOR DISMISSAL of the Original Indictment as to Donnell Pierce. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/8/04. (c/m cc/USM 4/8/04 jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Sentencing
                                                                                              Sentencing as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce. held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter S. Cook.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held on 1/6/2004 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: L Bankins. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/14/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/13/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/15/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/12/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/8/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/9/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                              Sentencing hearing as to Warren Blount and Donnell Pierce held before Judge Mavin J. Garbis - NOT CONCLUDED - counsel to contact chambers (Reporter: S. Cook) (bma, CourtClerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Stipulation re: Return of Exhibits to Counsel
                                                                                                                Stipulation re: Return of exhibits to Counsel (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Stipulation re: Certification of Exhibits Submitte
                                                                                                                  Stipulation re: Certification of Exhibits Submitted to the Jury (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                    SPECIAL VERDICT FORM as to Warren Blount (1) Guilty on Count 1s,2s and Donnell Pierce (2) Guilty on Count 1s,2s-3s. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Order on Motion for New TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [83] Motion of defendant for New Trial as to Donnell Pierce (2). Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/23/04. (c/m 1/28/04 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                        Authorization for juror meal (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004, Terminated: 1/29/2004 Motion for New Trial
                                                                                                                          MOTION for New Trial by Donnell Pierce. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by Thomas L. Crowe as counsel for Tyrone Thomas (witness) (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Sentencing OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Guideline Sentencing Order as to Donnell Pierce.. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/16/04. (c/m 1/22/04 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                JURY VERDICT as to Warren Blount (1) Guilty on Count 1s,2s and Donnell Pierce (2) Guilty on Count 1s,2s-3s. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                  Jury polled at the request of the Defendants.? (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                    Courts charge to the jury and final arguments of counsel. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                      Oral motion of defendants Warren Blount and Donnell Pierce for Acquittal made at the conclusion of all the evidence "DENIED" for reasons stated in open court. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                        Jury Trial Day 7 as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter J. Sovich.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                          Jury Trial Day 6 as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter J. Sovich.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                            Jury Trial Day 5 as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter J. Sovich.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                              Interpreter sworn Martha Gutierrez-Sheperd (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial Day 4 as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter J. Sovich.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                  Jury Trial Day3 as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter J. Sovice.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                    Jury Trial Day 2 as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter S. Cook.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Order on Motion to SuppressCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [49] Motion to Suppress as to Donnell Pierce (2). Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/5/04. (c/faxed 1/5/04 jw)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                        Opening statements of counsel. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                          Jury Trial Day 1 as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Voir Dire Begun
                                                                                                                                                            Voir Dire begun on 1/6/2004 Warren Blount (1) on Count 1s,2s and Donnell Pierce (2) on Count 1s,2s-3s held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine RE: Murder Incident by Donnell Pierce. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT LIST by Donnell Pierce (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Donnell Pierce (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation regarding return of exhibits (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion Hearing as to Donnell Pierce re [49] MOTION to Suppress filed by Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. "HELD SUB CURIA" for reasons stated in open court. (Court Reporter B. Shaulis.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                        Arraignment as to Donnell Pierce (2) Count 1s,2s-3s held on 12/30/2003, Plea entered by Donnell Pierce Not Guilty on counts 1s,2s,3s. held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter B. Shaulis.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Regarding Impeachment by Prior Conviction for Possession with Intent to Distribute and Points and Authorities by Donnell Pierce. (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 2/10/2004 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            Telephone Conference as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/13/03. (c/m 8/14/03 Chambers) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                Scheduling Conference as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis (by telephone, in chambers). (mjl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Government's intention to seek enhanced minimum mandatory sentences as to Donnell Pierce (c/s)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to Donnell Pierce's [49] MOTION to Suppress. Replies due by 8/11/2003. (c/s)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2004 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Suppress all Evidence and Statements obtained from Defendant Donnell Pierce. Responses due by 7/31/2003 (c/s)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                        Superseding INDICTMENT as to Warren Blount (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, Donnell Pierce (2) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, Terrance Thomas (3) count(s) 1s, Benjamin Brown (4) count(s) 1s. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/9/03 as to Donnell Pierce. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [43] Letter/Motion for Extension of Motions Deadline until 7/14/03 as to Warren Blount (1), Donnell Pierce (2), Terrance Thomas (3), Benjamin Brown (4). Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/23/03. (c/m 6/24/03 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER/MOTION for Extension of Motions Deadline until 7/14/03 by USA as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Responses due by 7/14/2003 (c/s)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                Arraignment as to Donnell Pierce (2) Count 1,2 held on 6/13/2003, Plea entered by Donnell Pierce Not Guilty on counts 1-2 held before Judge James K. Bredar. (Tape #1093.) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Donnell Pierce submitting Receipt for Forfeiture of Property for Non-Appearance with Conditions of Release pursuant to [32] Order. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER/ Agreement to Forfeit Property for Non-Appearance or Non-Compliance with Conditions of Release as to Donnell Pierce. Signed by Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/16/03.(h/d sd 5/16/03) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO RECORD AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT PROPERTY as to Donnell Pierce. Signed by Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/16/03.(h/d sd 5/16/03) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Donnell Pierce.. Signed by Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/16/03.(h/d sd 5/16/03) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Detention Hearing as to Donnell Pierce held before Judge Beth P. Gesner, defendant released with conditions set by the Court. (Tape #1076 & 1077) (std, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Donnell Pierce : Appointment of Attorney Gary Allen Ticknor for Donnell Pierce. Signed by Donna Shearer 5/12/03 (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Donnell Pierce. Signed by Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/13/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Ira Alperstein appearing for Donnell Pierce (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Detention Hearing as to Donnell Pierce POSTPONED until 5/16/03 by Judge Beth P. Gesner. (Court Reporter S. Davis.) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Detention Hearing as to Donnell Pierce held before Judge Beth P. Gesner, hearing postponed until 5/16/03 @ 2:00 pm. (Tape #1073) (std, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing Pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Donnell Pierce. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 5/9/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Donnell Pierce (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [17] Motion of United States to Unseal Indictment and Arrest Warrants as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1), Sealed Defendant 2 (2), Sealed Defendant 3 (3), Sealed Defendant 4 (4). Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 5/9/03. (c/m 5/12/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003, Terminated: 5/9/2003 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Indictment and Arrest Warrants by USA as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4. Responses due by 5/27/2003. (c/s)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Initial Appearance as to Donnell Pierce (Defendant informed of Rights.) held before Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (Court Reporter S, Davis.) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?