USA v. Warren Blount, et al
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-cr-00004-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Michael Wolff +1 301 344 4434 +1 301 344 4516

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Baltimore
Filed 1/2/2003
County Baltimore City
Terminated 7/12/2004
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21846 - Conspiracy to Possess with Intent to Distribute Narcotics
Count 1s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846 CONSPIRACY TO POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE NARCOTICS
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 161 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/11/08. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 155 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 USCA Order
    ORDER of USCA (certified copy)"Consolidating" these cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument as therein set forth as to Donnell Pierce, Benjamin Brown re [153] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [143] Notice of Appeal - (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 154 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 USCA Order
      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) "Consolidating" these cases (07-4923 & 07-4997)for purpose of briefing and oral argument as therein set forth as to Warren Blount, USA re [144] Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release, [152] Notice of Appeal - (nrm, Deputy Clerk) .
        LREF
        Blank 141 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER DIRECTING that the re-sentencing herein is deferred until scheduled by further Order as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/12/07. (c/m Chambers 3/12/07 mcb, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 128 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 CJA 20 Appointment
          CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Thomas L Crowe for Tyrone Thomas. (c/m 12/7/04 dtm) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 123 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            MOTION for dismissal of original indictment and APPROVAL as to Terrance Thomas. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 7/15/04. (c/m 7/15/05 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
              JUDGMENT as to Terrance Thomas (3), Count(s) 1, Dismissed; Count(s) 1s, Imprisonment for a total term of 210 months to run concurrent with sentence defendant is now serving in S-00-0415; Supervised Release for a term of 5 years to run concurrent with the 6 years imposed in S-00-0415; Assessment $100.00. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 7/12/04. (c/m 7/13/04 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2005 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Sentencing
                Sentencing as to Terrance Thomas held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis (Court Reporter M. Zajac) (ggpb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 106 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Sentencing OrderCourt Filing
                  Guideline Sentencing Order as to Terrance Thomas.. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/6/04. (c/m 5/6/04 jts) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 105 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Exhibit
                    EXHIBIT LIST (Plea Agreement) by USA as to Terrance Thomas (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Arraignment
                      Arraignment as to Terrance Thomas (3) Count 1s held on 5/6/2004, Plea entered by Terrance Thomas (3) Guilty Count 1s held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (Court Reporter Zajac.) (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 97 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/14/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 96 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/13/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 95 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/15/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 94 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/12/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 93 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/8/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 92 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/9/04 before Judge Garbis. Court Reporter: J Sovich. (FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 91 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                    MARGINAL ORDER granting [90] Motion of defendant for Leave to File additional motions as to Terrance Thomas (3). Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/24/04. (c/m 3/24/04 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 90 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004, Terminated: 3/24/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION for Leave to File additional motions by Terrance Thomas. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 81 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of appearance by Thomas L. Crowe as counsel for Tyrone Thomas (witness) (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 69 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 CJA 20 Appointment
                                          CJA Appointment Michael Montemarano as to Thomas. Signed by Donna Shearer on 12/4/03. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 67 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                            MARGINAL ORDER granting [66] Letter Motion requesting the release of the PSIR in client's first federal prosecution, Case No. 00-415 as to Terrance Thomas (3). Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/22/03. (c/m 12/22/03 jw) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 66 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003, Terminated: 12/22/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              LETTER MOTION requesting the release of the PSIR in client's first federal prosecution as to Terrance Thomas. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 65 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER GRANTING defendant a severance; SETTING date to commence trial as to Terrance Thomas. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/18/03. (c/m 12/19/03 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael D Montemarano appearing for Terrance Thomas (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER allowing Ricardo D. Zwaig to withdraw as counsel as to Terrance Thomas (3). Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/25/03. (c/m 11/26/2003) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003, Terminated: 11/26/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ricardo D. Zwaig. as to Terrance Thomas. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE of government's intention to seek enhanced minimum mandatory sentence by Terrance Thomas (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/13/03. (c/m 8/14/03 Chambers) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Scheduling Conference
                                                            Scheduling Conference as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown held before Judge Marvin J. Garbis (by telephone, in chambers). (mjl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Indictment
                                                              Superseding INDICTMENT as to Warren Blount (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, Donnell Pierce (2) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, Terrance Thomas (3) count(s) 1s, Benjamin Brown (4) count(s) 1s. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [43] Letter/Motion for Extension of Motions Deadline until 7/14/03 as to Warren Blount (1), Donnell Pierce (2), Terrance Thomas (3), Benjamin Brown (4). Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/23/03. (c/m 6/24/03 jw) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                  LETTER/MOTION for Extension of Motions Deadline until 7/14/03 by USA as to Warren Blount, Donnell Pierce, Terrance Thomas, Benjamin Brown. Responses due by 7/14/2003 (c/s)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                    CJA 20 as to Terrance Thomas : Appointment of Attorney Ricardo D Zwaig for Terrance Thomas. Signed by Donna Shearer on 6/6/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 6/16/03 dps)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ricardo D Zwaig appearing for Terrance Thomas (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Arraignment
                                                                        Arraignment as to Terrance Thomas (3) Count 1 held on 6/13/2003, Plea entered by Terrance Thomas Not Guilty on count 1. held before Judge James K. Bredar. (Tape #1092.) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed as to Terrance Thomas. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER OF DETENTION By Agreement as to Terrance Thomas. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 6/10/03. (c/m 6/10/03 jts) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Detention Hearing
                                                                              Detention Hearing as to Terrance Thomas held before Judge James K. Bredar. (Court Reporter er: Smith.) (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing Pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Terrance Thomas. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/6/03. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Initial Appearance
                                                                                  Initial Appearance as to Terrance Thomas (Defendant informed of Rights.) held before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (Court Reporter er: Smith.) (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [17] Motion of United States to Unseal Indictment and Arrest Warrants as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1), Sealed Defendant 2 (2), Sealed Defendant 3 (3), Sealed Defendant 4 (4). Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 5/9/03. (c/m 5/12/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003, Terminated: 5/9/2003 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Indictment and Arrest Warrants by USA as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4. Responses due by 5/27/2003. (c/s)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?