USA v. Stup
Federal Court Proceeding Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-mj-02615-JKB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Joseph J. Stup, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra Sasha Natapoff +1 410 962 3962
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/11/2002
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 4/25/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-1600.M
Offense Level 3
1813-1600.M ASSAULT
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Initial Appearance
Initial Appearance as to Joseph J. Stup (Defendant informed of Rights.) held before Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (Tape #1.) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
    ORDER granting in part and denying in part [5] Motion to Continue as to Joseph J. Stup (1) and rescheduling case for trial for March 28, 2003 to allow suitability for pretrial diversion program to be investigated. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/6/03. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 4/30/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2003 Motion to Continue
      MOTION to Continue by USA as to Joseph J. Stup. Responses due by 1/6/2003 (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 4/30/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexandra Sasha Natapoff appearing for Joseph J. Stup (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
          ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Joseph J. Stup. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/11/02. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
            CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate by Joseph J. Stup (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
              CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joseph J. Stup (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 47 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?