USA v. Ayala
Federal Court Proceeding Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:02-mj-02748-JKB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/16/2002
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 4/22/2004
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7210.M
Offense Level 3
1813-7210.M DRIVING WHILE UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF ALCOHOL
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting [10] Motion to Dismiss as to Franchi D. Ayala (1). Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/22/04. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2004 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by USA as to Franchi D. Ayala. Responses due by 5/7/2004 (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [8] Motion to Continue as to Franchi D. Ayala Trial Date Set for April 23, 2004 at 12:30 p.m.(1). Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/3/04. (c/m 3/4/04-cl) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Motion to Continue
        MOTION to Continue by Franchi D. Ayala. Responses due by 3/15/2004 (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004, Terminated: 2/2/2004 Motion to Continue
          MOTION to Continue by Franchi D. Ayala. Responses due by 2/23/2004 (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [6] Motion to Continue as to Franchi D. Ayala Trial Date Set for 3/5/04 at 12:30 p.m. (1). Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/2/04. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
              CJA 20 as to Franchi D. Ayala : Appointment of Attorney Christopher Flohr for Franchi D. Ayala. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 11/21/03. (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Franchi D. Ayala (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Initial Appearance
                  Initial Appearance as to Franchi D. Ayala (Defendant informed of Rights.) held before Judge James K. Bredar. (E.R.: Goldsmith.) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [2] Motion to Continue until November 14, 2003 as to Franchi D. Ayala (1). Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 3/19/03. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003, Terminated: 3/20/2003 Motion to Continue
                      MOTION to Continue by USA as to Franchi D. Ayala. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
                        CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate by Franchi D. Ayala (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 55 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?