Merrill Lynch v. Sussman
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00008-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denis J Charlesworth +1 158 546 7430 +1 585 546 7514

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Lewis Bernstein +1 410 547 8705 +1 410 659 0436 gbernstein@zuckerman.com
v.
No Logo Ronald M. Sussman, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Baltimore County
Terminated 1/27/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Bond
BOND $ 1000.00 entered by Merrill Lynch in response to Court Order for TRO. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER of DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE and "APPROVAL." Each party is to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed, in which event the costs shall be adjusted between the parties in accordance with their Agreement. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 1/27/03) (c/i & Microfilmed 1/27/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [2-1] Motion of Plaintiff for Temporary Restraining Order and DIRECTING that security in the amount of $1,000 be posted and ENJOINING and RESTRAINING Defendant from soliciting or initiating similar contact or communication with any client of Merrill Lynch; or records of Merrill Lynch Defendant used in violation of Par. 1 of Agreement; and any and all other such acts as this Court deems appropriate for injunctive relief. (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 1/2/03) (c/i 1/3/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Summons Issued
          SUMMONS(ES) (30 days) issued for Ronald M. Sussman (raf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Supplemental
            SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum of law regarding the National Association of Securities Dealers'new injunctive rule effective March 25, 2002 by Merrill Lynch and exhibits A and B (raf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Motion for TRO
              MOTION with memorandum in support by Merrill Lynch for Temporary Restraining Order , and for Preliminary Injunction and exhibits A thru Z, 1 and 2 and affadavit of Ray Moreau (raf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/02/2003
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Complaint
                COMPLAINT and exhibits A thru D filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1191144 (raf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 182 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?