Podgurski, et al v. Thaney, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00149-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James F. Podgurski, Plaintiff
No Logo Johnnie G. Sturgill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Salsbury Clements Bekman Marder and Adkins LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Bekman +1 410 539 6633 +1 410 625 9554 bekman@scbmalaw.com
Space Michael Patrick Smith +1 410 539 6633 +1 410 625 9554 Smith@scbmalaw.com
v.
No Logo Baltimore Medical Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com
No Logo Kathleen Thaney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com
No Logo Neighborcare Pharmacies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ECCLESTON & WOLF, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R Scott Krause +1 410 752 7474 +1 410 752 0611 krause@ewmd.com
Space Charles Martinez +1 410 752 7474 +1 410 752 0611 martinez@ewmd.com
United States of America United States of America, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/16/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 2/21/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 24-C-02006724[CC Baltimore City MD]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal of defendants, Kathleen Thaney, CRNP, Baltimore Medical System, Inc. and Neighborcare Pharmacies, Inc., without prejudice and APPROVAL (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 2/21/03) (c/i & microfilmed 2/21/03) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed (eg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Local Rule
      Local Rule 103.5 Certification by United States (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/2003
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint by Neighborcare (Attorney Charles Martinez, R Scott Krause) (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Summons Returned Executed
          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kathleen Thaney 12/22/02 (eg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Summons Issued
            SUMMONS(ES) 30 days issued for Kathleen Thaney, Baltimore Medical, Neighborcare (eg, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Remark
              The above pleadings nos. 10, 11 and 12 are copies of papers filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City MD (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Correspondence
                CORRESPONDENCE from Michael P Smith RE: Stipulation of dismissal (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 2/21/2003 Response
                  RESPONSE by United States to [6-1] standing order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by United States, Baltimore Medical, Kathleen Thaney (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      STANDING ORDER concerning removal ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m 1/17/03 nm) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Remark
                        Pleading No. #7 are copies of a papers filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, MD (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Remark
                          notice of removal mailed to counsel. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Motion to Substitute Party
                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Kathleen Thaney, Baltimore Medical to substitute party by United States , and to Dismiss and exhibits A thru C. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Local Rule
                              Local Rule 103.5 Certification filed by Kathleen Thaney, Baltimore Medical (nrm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/17/2003
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Jury Demand
                                DEMAND for jury trial by James F. Podgurski (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT and attachments filed; (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Notice of Removal
                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL; (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Remark
                                      ABOVE PLEADINGS ARE ALL COPIES OF PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY, MARYLAND. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?