Williams v. Barnhart
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00152-PWG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John R. Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by mervideo.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E Mering +1 410 837 8817 +1 410 528 1059 temering@mervideo.com
v.
No Logo JoAnne B. Barnhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristine L. Sendek Smith +1 202 789 6063 +1 202 789 6190 ksendeksmith@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ariana Wright Arnold +1 410 209 4883 +1 410 962 9947 Ariana.Arnold@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/16/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 863 - D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W. (US Defendant)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Reversed Decision in Whole or Part
County Baltimore County
Terminated 3/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
ORDER granting [16] Motion of plaintiff for Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,375.00. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/27/04.(c/m 4/28/04) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Correspondence
    Correspondence from defendant re: Office of General Counsel does not object to an award of attorney's fees. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004, Terminated: 4/28/2004 Motion for Attorney Fees
      MOTION for Attorney Fees by John R. Williams. Responses due by 4/29/2004 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Order on Motion to RemandCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [8] Motion of plaintiff to Remand, granting in part and denying in part [8] Motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment, denying [11] Motion of defendant for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/11/04.(c/m pkc) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/11/04. (c/m pkc)(slf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
            ORDER EXTENDING the time for defendant's motion for summary judgment through 10/17/03. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/7/03. (c/m 10/7/03 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003, Terminated: 10/7/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
              CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time by JoAnne B. Barnhart. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                MOTION, memorandum for Summary Judgment by JoAnne B. Barnhart. Responses due by 10/20/2003 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [9] Motion of defendant for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment is extended to 9/25/03 and plaintiff's reply due 10/10/03. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/26/03. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003, Terminated: 8/27/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                    CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment by JoAnne B. Barnhart. Responses due by 9/15/2003 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Motion to Remand
                      MOTION to Remand, or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by John R. Williams. Responses due by 7/28/2003 Responses due by 7/28/2003 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/21/03. (c/m 4/22/03)(slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Transcript
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before HHS (file separately) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Answer
                            ANSWER to Complaint by JoAnne B. Barnhart.(slf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Acknowledgment of Service
                              ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on AUSA, John Ashcroft and Jo-Anne Barnhart on 2/24/03 filed by John R. Williams. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                CONSENT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm for all further proceedings and final disposition. Signed by Judge Andre M Davis on 4/1/02. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Summons Issued
                                  SUMMONS (60 days) issued for JoAnne B. Barnhart (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT and attachments filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1191648 (ljs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/17/2003
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?