Petitlubin v. Fayetteville Motors Fifth, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-00005

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 8:58 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated wit hin 60 days hereof. The plaintiff is directed to file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice on or before Monday, October 24, 2016. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/23/2016. (Baker, C.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Notice-Failure to Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER denying 8 Motion for Entry of Default - The motion for entry of default is DENIED without prejudice to renew within 30 days. Any renewed motion for entry of default must be supported by evidence that the defendant was served with process under federal or North Carolina law. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 5/12/2016. (Baker, C.)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Proposed Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Notice-Failure to Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 111 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?