Wilson v. Thompson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00234-CCB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ellen M. Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alvin T Prestwood +1 334 264 6401 +1 334 834 4954 hah@bellsouth.net
v.
No Logo Tommy Thompson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/27/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 11/12/2003
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '04-1999'['Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA and certified copy of the judgment as to [30] Notice of Appeal filed by Ellen M. Wilson. (USCA # 04-1999) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 USCA Judgment
    JUDGMENT of USCA affirming the judgment of the District Court as to [30] Notice of Appeal filed by Ellen M. Wilson (USCA No. 04-1999). (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004, Terminated: 7/13/2005 USCA Order
      ORDER of USCA "DENYING" petitioner's petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc as to [30] Notice of Appeal filed by Ellen M. Wilson (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/23/2004 (sls, Deputy Clerk).
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004, Terminated: 7/13/2005 Certificate of Clerk
        Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: [30] Notice of Appeal (das, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004, Terminated: 7/13/2005 USCA Case Number
          USCA Case Number 04-1999 for [30] Notice of Appeal filed by Ellen M. Wilson. (Case Manager - Anthony Webb) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004, Terminated: 7/13/2005 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [30] Notice of Appeal (das, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [28] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Ellen M. Wilson. Filing fee $ 255 received 8/9/04, receipt number 1206285. Appeal Record due by 9/7/2004. (8/6/04 "Notice" Filed Incorrectly)(das, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE by Ellen M. Wilson Notice of Appeal (Prestwood, Alvin) Modified on 8/10/2004 (das, Deputy Clerk). (FILED IN ERROR) Modified on 8/10/2004 (das, Deputy Clerk).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [26] Motion of Plaintiff for relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/10/04. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
                    RESPONSE in Opposition DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT OF ORDER filed by Tommy Thompson. Replies due by 5/3/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit)(Huesman, Jennifer)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004, Terminated: 6/10/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      MOTION Under 60(b)(1) For Relief From Judgment of Order dated 11/12/03 by Ellen M. Wilson. Responses due by 4/22/2004 (Prestwood, Alvin)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [16] Motion of Defendant to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment and DISMISSING the Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/12/03. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/12/03. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Memorandum
                            Memorandum re [16] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Tommy Thompson. (Huesman, Jennifer)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE to Motion re [16] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Ellen M. Wilson. Replies due by 8/11/2003. (Attachments: # (1) pg.1 of Exhibit 2 Deposition parts of J. Vaitukaitis, M.D.# (2) pg. 2 of Deposition of J. Vaitukaitis, M.D.# (3) Exhibit pg. 1 of Exhibit 3 - hearing transcript# (4) Exhibit pg. 2 of Exhibit 3 - hearing transcipt# (5) Exhibit Order - Jan. 17, 2003 page 1# (6) Exhibit Order - Jan. 17, 2003 - page 2# (7) Exhibit Order - Jan. 17, 2003 page 3# (8) Exhibit Order - Jan. 17, 2003 page 4# (9) Exhibit hearing transcript - page 1# (10) Exhibit hearing transcript - page 2# (11) Exhibit hearing transcript - page 3# (12) Exhibit hearing transcript page 4# (13) Exhibit Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment - page 1# (14) Exhibit Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment - page 2# (15) Exhibit Hearing transcript Volume IV - page 1# (16) Exhibit transcript hearing Volume IV - page 2)(Prestwood, Alvin)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [20] Letter Motion of plaintiff for Extension of Time to file response to defendant's motion to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment until 7/28/03. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/18/03. (c/m 6/18/03 chambers) (See paper #20) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to defendant's motion to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment by Ellen M. Wilson. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff's response to Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative for Summary Judgment is due 7/1/03 and Defendant's Reply 7/23/03. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 05/23/03. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [15] Motion to Withdraw Attorney Leura G. Canary. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 05/23/03. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tommy Thompson re [16] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment (Huesman, Jennifer)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003, Terminated: 11/12/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Tommy Thompson. Responses due by 5/27/2003 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Huesman, Jennifer)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003, Terminated: 5/23/2003 Motion to Withdraw
                                        MOTION to Withdraw Martha Ann Miller Assistant U. S. Attorney Middle District of Alabama by Tommy Thompson. Responses due by 4/14/2003 (c/s)(jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [13] Motion of Defendant for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint to 5/12/03. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 03/05/03. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003, Terminated: 3/5/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tommy Thompson. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                              MEMORANDUM DIRECTING Counsel to advise the status of this case and who will be representing the parties no later than 3/3/03. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 2/21/03 ) (c/m 2/21/03-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Correspondence/Local Rule 101
                                                Correspondence/Local Rule 101 sent (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [7-2] motion to Transfer for Improper Venue Signed by Myron H. Thompson United States District Court Judge for the Middle District of Alabama, Northern Division (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Response in Opposition
                                                    RESPONSE by Ellen M. Wilson in opposition to [7-1] motion to Dismiss, [7-2] motion to Transfer for Improper Venue (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003, Terminated: 1/27/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                      MOTION by Tommy Thompson to Dismiss , or to Transfer for Improper Venue and Exhibits 1 through 6 (ljs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/27/2003
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Tommy Thompson (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Summons Issued
                                                          SUMMONS (60 days) issued for Tommy Thompson (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Jury Demand
                                                            DEMAND for jury trial by Ellen M. Wilson (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT filed; (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                Original file consisting of pleadings: 1 through 10; certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. (Northern Division) (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?