Dukes Inc v. General Motors Corp et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC168676

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dukes, Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officer/Director, General Motors Co
Officer/Director, Panamsat Corp
Officer/Director, Lennox International Inc.

Represented by Belcher Henzie & Biegenzahn Law O/o

No Logo Rolls-royce Plc, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Belcher Henzie & Biegenzahn Law O/o

No Logo Lehrman June, Mediator
Type Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 02/28/2000
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 Request For Dismissal
DISMISS ENTIRE ACTIION, WITH PREJUDICE, SIGNED BY ATTYS. FOR PLTFF/CROSS-DEFT. AND DEFT./CROSS- COMPLAINANT.
    Blank 32 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Notice
    NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
      Blank 31 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Notice
      of all purpose case reassignmen
        Blank 30 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 Notice of Reassignment and Order
          Blank 29 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 Notice of Continuance
          NTC OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON OSC.
            Blank 28 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/22/1999 Notice of Continuance
              Blank 27 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Notice Of Ruling
                Blank 26 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 Stipulation and Order
                TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL OF 6/7/99
                  Blank 25 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Statement-Non-Agreement
                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 Notice of Continuance
                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 Declaration
                      DECLARATION OF S. ROGER ROMBRO IN SUPPORT OF EXTENDED MEDIATION RETURN DATE
                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 Stipulation and Order
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION RETURN DATE POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON
                          Blank 21 Filed: 12/31/1998, Entered: 12/31/1998 Order
                            Blank 20 Filed: 12/31/1998, Entered: 12/31/1998 Exparte Application
                            TO CONTINUE MEDIATION RETURN DATE AND POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
                              Blank 19 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/4/1998 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                Blank 18 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/9/1998 Notice-Assignment-Arbitrator
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998 Status Conference Questionnaire
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Status Conference Questionnaire
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/16/1998 Complaint
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 Answer
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 Cross Complaint
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 Opposition Document
                                                      OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF STEVE NATOLE'S UNTIMELY AND IMPROPER SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LINFIELD
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 Declaration
                                                        DECLARATION OF ALAN G. SALER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY AND IMPROPER SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FRED ALEXANDER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 Proof of Service
                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Proof of Service
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/5/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Ord to Show Cause
                                                              Ntc to Appear
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Complaint
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/31/1987, Entered: 12/31/1987 Complaint

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?