USA v. Cottrell
Federal Court Proceeding Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-mj-00049-JKB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/2/2003
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 2/24/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-3800.M
Offense Level 3
1813-3800.M THEFT OF PROPERTY
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joanna Silver appearing for Rachael L. Cottrell (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter Raymond Johnson appearing for Rachael L. Cottrell (jas, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
      ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Rachael L. Cottrell (Pete Johnson, AFPD Duty, appeared in court). Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 01/15/2004. (dms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rachael L. Cottrell (dms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Initial Appearance
          Initial Appearance as to Rachael L. Cottrell (Defendant informed of Rights.) held before Judge James K. Bredar. (dms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MOTION to Re-Docket by USA as to Rachael L. Cottrell. Responses due by 5/23/2003 (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
              JUDGMENT Rachael L. Cottrell (1) count(s) 1. Pretrial Diversion ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar ) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Initial Appearance
                Initial appearance as to Rachael L. Cottrell held before Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar (ER: Goldsmith) (Defendant informed of rights.) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
                  CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate by Rachael L. Cottrell (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 131 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?