USA v. Sala
Federal Court Proceeding Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-mj-00067-JKB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pia WaNita Rogers +1 301 677 9096 +1 301 677 9576

Toggle Switch Represented by reese-carney.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E Erskine +1 410 740 4600 wee@reese-carney.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/2/2003
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 5/16/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-3800.M
Offense Level 3
1813-3800.M THEFT OF PUBLIC PROPERTY
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting [7] Motion to Dismiss as to Jennifer L. Sala (1). Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 1/14/04. (c/m 1/15/04-cl) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004, Terminated: 1/14/2004 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by USA as to Jennifer L. Sala. Responses due by 1/26/2004 (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [5] Motion to Place on Inactive Docket as to removal from March 7, 2003 docket and case rescheduled for May 16, 2003 @ 11:00 A.M. as to Jennifer L. Sala (1). Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/7/03. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003, Terminated: 3/7/2003 Motion to Continue
        MOTION to Place on Inactive Docketby USA as to Jennifer L. Sala. Responses due by 3/24/2003 (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Motion for Discovery
          MOTION for Discovery by Jennifer L. Sala. Responses due by 1/30/2003 (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Remark
            Waiver of Initial Appearance (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William E Erskine appearing for Jennifer L. Sala (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
                CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate by Jennifer L. Sala (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 34 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?