USA v. Rojas
Federal Court Proceeding Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-mj-00399-JKB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Ismael Rojas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Raymond Johnson +1 310 295 1785 +1 310 697 3564

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra Sasha Natapoff +1 410 962 3962
Office Baltimore
Filed 2/4/2003
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 5/30/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7220.M
Offense Level 3
1813-7220.M DRIVING UNINSURED VEHICLE
Def Custody Status
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Bench Trial - Held
Bench Trial as to Ismael Rojas held before Judge Susan K. Gauvey. Defendant found Not Guilty. Interpreter: Benningfield. (Court Reporter er: Smith.) (jas, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [5] Motion to Dismiss in Part and Continue in Part as to Ismael Rojas (1). Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/16/03. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003, Terminated: 5/16/2003 Motion to Continue
      MOTION Dismiss in Part and Continue in Part by USA as to Ismael Rojas. Responses due by 6/2/2003 Responses due by 6/2/2003 (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter Raymond Johnson appearing for Ismael Rojas (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexandra Sasha Natapoff appearing for Ismael Rojas (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
            ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Ismael Rojas. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 02/14/03. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Initial Appearance
              Initial Appearance as to Ismael Rojas (Defendant informed of Rights.) held before Judge James K. Bredar. (Tape #1.) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
                CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate by Ismael Rojas (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?