Silvia Mancha v. George Goldstein et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC189216

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Coldwell Banker Jon Douglas Company, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Coldwell Banker Real Estate Corporation, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Goldstein, George, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Jon Douglas Company, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Oberfeld Fabian, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Sneider Richard, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
Washington Mutual Bank, FA Washington Mutual Bank, FA, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Litz Ronald A. & Associates Law O/o

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Mancha Silvia, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Walsh & Walsh

Type Other Real Property Rights Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Removal to Federal Court 05/18/1998
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 miscellaneous other
STATUS REPORT
    Blank 7 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 Notice
    OF BANKRUPTCY RE; GEORGE GOLDSTEIN
      Blank 6 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Declaration
      OF DOUGLAS L. WALSH;
        Blank 5 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Ord to Show Cause
        Ntc to Appear
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Answer
            Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/15/1998 Answer
              Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/15/1998 Cross Complaint
                Blank 1 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 Complaint

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?