Roberta Smith v. Alice Beck et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC189962

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aquadios Corp., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherwood & Hardgrove Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Beck Alice, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherwood & Hardgrove Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherwood & Hardgrove Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Corrodi Jack, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherwood & Hardgrove Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Jenson Alan, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherwood & Hardgrove Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Law Dept. Coldwell Banker Res. Brokerage
No Logo Guerin Jane, Mediator
No Logo Smith, Robert A., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Steven L. Zelig & Associates Law Offices

Type Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)
Status Transferred to Municipal Court 09/13/1999
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Notice Of Ruling
on status conference
    Blank 25 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Receipt for Case/Ch of Venue/Trans
      Blank 24 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Points and Authorities
        Blank 23 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
          Blank 22 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Statement of Facts
            Blank 21 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Declaration
              Blank 20 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Notice
              OF ORDERS AT EX PARTE APPLICATION
                Blank 19 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Notice
                  of orders
                    Blank 17 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Reply/Response
                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Notice of Motion
                      o deem requests for admissions
                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Motion to Compel
                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999 Notice
                          and submission of original proof of service
                            Blank 13 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Proof of Service
                              Notice and Submission of Original
                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Notice Of Ruling
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 Status Conference Questionnaire
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Notice
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Motion to Compel
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998 Answer
                                        and general denial to all allegations
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 Order
                                          on Appl. for Waiv. of Ct. Fees & Costs
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Answer
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Complaint
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Notice
                                                  and submission of original proof of service of summons & complaint served upon Coldwell Banker Corp.
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 Complaint

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?