Benetia Ann James Young El v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00105

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2018 at 7:26 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. On July 7, 2016, the Court granted defendants' Beckenridge Property Fund 2015, LLC and Sam Chandra's motion to dismiss without prejudice and admonished plaintiff that failure to file an amended complaint by August 8, 2016, would result in dismissal of the action with prejudice, as to these defendants 25 . To date, Plaintiff has failed to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, this case is hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE, as to defendants Beckenridge Property Fund 2015, LLC and Sam Chandra, only. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?