Rti Temps Inc v. Xtend Micro Products Inc et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC232590
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Rti Temps Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Iverson Yoakum Papiano & Hatch

v.
No Logo Rapparport Mark, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lindberg Craig E. Law Offices Of

No Logo Xtend Micro Products, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lindberg Craig E. Law Offices Of

Attributes
Type Ins Coverage (not Complex) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 05/14/2001
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 miscellaneous other
Joint Status Conference Statement
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Declaration
of Craig E. Lindberg re Status of Discovery & Contemplated Law & Motion
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Declaration
OF LAURA CITRANO REGARDING COMPLETED AND PENDING DISCOVERY ON BEHALF OF RTI TEMPS, INC.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 8 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice of Change of Address
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 7 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice
order to show caise re sanctions a s to plaintiff
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Status Conference Questionnaire
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Declaration
of Craig E. Lindberg in Support of OSC re: Sanctions . . .
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Status Conference Questionnaire
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Notice of Status Conference filed
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Answer
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 1 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 Complaint
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?