Renee Perez Davis v. Jonathan Davis
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC234837

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Davis, Jonathan, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Wasser, Cooperman & Carter

No Logo Davis Renee Perez, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Trope & Trope Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wiesner Susan E..
Type Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 04/27/2001
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Notice of Change of Address
    Blank 11 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Request For Dismissal
    WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION;
      Blank 10 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Notice of Continuance
      OF MTN TO DISQUALIFY;
        Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Notice of Continuance
          Blank 8 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Stipulation and Order
          RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE FROM 10-19-00 TO 11-6-00;
            Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Stipulation and Order
            RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY;
              Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Demurrer
                Blank 5 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Notice
                of demurrer to complaint and motion to strike
                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Notice of Motion
                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 Summons Filed
                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 Association Of Attorney
                      hereby associates Trope and Trope
                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 Complaint

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 1,197 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?