Salvador Selga v. Dukes Inc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC248490

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Chance Jimmie, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rombro Roger S.
No Logo Dukes, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rombro Roger S.
No Logo Selga Salvador, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Felahy & Associates Law Offices Of

Type Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/08/2002
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Request and Entry of Dismissal
W/PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT
    Blank 21 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Exparte Application
      Blank 20 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Order
      SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT
        Blank 19 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Points and Authorities
          Blank 18 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Notice of Motion
            Blank 17 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Statement of Facts
              Blank 16 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
              OR ALTERNATIVELY, MSA
                Blank 15 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Motion to Compel
                pltiff Salvador Salga's
                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Proof of Service
                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Notice
                    OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JIMMIE CHANCE
                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Notice
                      OF MEDIATION
                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Proof of Service
                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/29/2001, Entered: 9/29/2001 Notice
                          OF SELECTION OF MEDIATOR
                            Blank 9 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Status Conference Questionnaire
                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Proof of Service
                              by mail
                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Substitution of Attorney
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Notice, Association of Counsel
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Answer
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Declaration Of Diligence
                                        on Jimmie Chance
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Summons Filed
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Complaint

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?