.ro-med Incorporated v. Anita Stirt, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC140777

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adams, Nancy, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Williams Berges & Sanford

No Logo American Medsearch, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Rios, Joseph, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Stirt Anita, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Cowen Mamie, Defendant/Respondent's AKA
No Logo Promed Inc., Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Pro-med Incorporated"

Represented by Hart King & Coldren

Type Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 04/18/1997
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 4/18/1997 Request and Entry of Dismissal
W/PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION AND ALL RELATED X-ACTIONS
    Blank 15 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 3/28/1997 Declaration
    of Douglas E. Klein
      Blank 14 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Notice
      of dfdts. attys unavailability for trial.
        Blank 13 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997 Notice, Association of Counsel
        Williams, Berges & Sanford
          Blank 12 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 Proof of Service
          ON NANCY ADAMS
            Blank 11 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 Proof of Service
            PARTY SERVED: NANCY ADAMS
              Blank 10 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Answer To Cross-complaint
                Blank 9 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Proof of Service
                PARTY SERVED: NANCY ADAMS
                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Notice of Status Conference filed
                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Notice of Status Conference filed
                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: 6/10/1996 Proof of Service
                      by mail re sub. of atty. to: Nancy E. Adams, Pres. and Jance Weberman, Esq.
                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: 6/10/1996 Substitution of Attorney
                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: 2/27/1996 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                          JOSEPH RIOS TO BE DISMISSED WITH- OUT PREJUDICE ONLY.
                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                            ONLY DEFENDANT JOSEPH RIOS IS TO BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE et al.
                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 Complaint

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?