Alber Partiyeli Vs. First Interstate Bank Of Ca., et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC147097

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo First Interstate Bank Of California, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

No Logo Jones Glenn (doe 1), Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

No Logo Partiyeli Alber, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Arias & Ozzello P.c.

Type PI Other -DO NOT USE (General Jurisdiction)
Status Verdict 02/28/1997
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Memo Of Costs
    Blank 14 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 3/28/1997 Memo Of Costs
      Blank 13 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Notice of Entry of Judgment
        Blank 12 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/7/1997 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT
          Blank 11 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Statement of Case
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Answer to Amended Complaint
              Blank 9 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/7/1997 Proof of Service
              OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AMEND- MENT TO COMPLAINT
                Blank 8 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/3/1997 Answer to Amended Complaint
                answer to first amended complaint
                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: 12/12/1996 Notice
                  of ruling
                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 12/3/1996 Stipulation and Order
                    STIP & ORD STRIKING PORTIONS OF PLFT'S 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
                      ANS. TO 1ST. AMENDED COMPLAINT.
                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 9/27/1996 Amended Complaint
                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES
                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Amendment to Complaint
                          re doe 1: Glenn Jones, an individual
                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996 Complaint
                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: 1/3/1996 Substitution of Attorney

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?